Rivkin v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al.
Plaintiff: Vladimir Rivkin
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Fay Servicing Company, LLC and Albertelli Law Partners California, P.A.
Case Number: 2:2014cv02662
Filed: November 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION and ORDER 57 signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/3/2017 ORDERING the Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 54 ) CONTINUED to 2/9/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/5/16 ORDERING that JPMC shall have up to and including 12/9/2016 to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/17/16. The Court hereby GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 40 ) with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file his Second Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of this Order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER 38 for extension of time signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/28/2015. Defendant JPMC shall have to and including 10/1/2015 to respond to plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (Marciel, M)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/14/15 ORDERING that JPMC shall have to and including 7/27/2015 to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/27/15 re: 31 ORDERING time extended for defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (Meuleman, A)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/18/15. JPMC shall have to and including 3/25/15 to respond to the first amended complaint. (Manzer, C)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER 25 for extension of time signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/21/2015. Defendant JPMorgan Chase has to and including 2/19/2015 to respond to plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivkin v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir Rivkin
Represented By: Elena Rivkin Franz, NCAED
Represented By: Pamela Marion Schuur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Amy Michelle Spicer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing Company, LLC
Represented By: Christine E. Howson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertelli Law Partners California, P.A.
Represented By: Matthew Van Fleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?