Johnson v. Solorio et al
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Rafael T. Solorio, Maria D. Solorio and Alfredo Solorio
Case Number: 2:2014cv02683
Filed: November 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/9/2017 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2). CASE CLOSED(Reader, L)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/17/17 ORDERING that the hearing on plaintiff's 26 motion for summary judgment is CONTINUED to 5/3/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Bre nnan. Defendants shall show cause, in writing, no later than 4/19/2017, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to timely file an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to the pending motion. Defendants shall file an opposition to the mo tion, or a statement of non-opposition thereto, no later than 4/19/2017. Failure of defendants to file an opposition to the motion will be deemed a statement of non-opposition thereto, and may result in a recommendation that plaintiff's motion be granted. Plaintiff may file a reply to defendants' opposition, if any, on or before 4/26/2017.(Kastilahn, A)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/16/15 ORDERING the Findings and Recommendations filed September 15, 2015 (ECF No. 16 ) are ADOPTED IN FULL; and Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment (ECF No. 11 ) is DENIED without prejudice to the filing of a subsequent properly-supported motion. (Becknal, R)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/15/2015 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 11 application for default judgment be denied without prejudice to a subsequent properly-supported motion. Motion referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Solorio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Mark D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael T. Solorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria D. Solorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Solorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?