Cooley v. City of Vallejo et al
Plaintiff: Frederick Marceles Cooley
Defendant: City of Vallejo, Dustin Joseph and David McLaughlin
Case Number: 2:2014cv02824
Filed: December 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/12/16 RECOMMENDING that this matter be dismissed pursuant to Rule 25(a)(1), based upon the statement of plaintiff's death, and the failure of plaintiff's successor or representative to file a motion for substitution within 90 days of service. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/04/16 ORDERING that within 14 days defendants shall file proofs of service of a suggestion of death upon Frederick Marceles Cooley, Jr. and Ms. Johnson in accordance with Rule 4; any motion for su bstitution by Frederick Marceles Cooley, Jr., accompanied by a motion to appoint a guardian ad litem, shall be filed by a licensed attorney within 90 days of the service of the suggestion of death in accordance with the terms of this order. If a proper and timely motion for substitution is not filed, the court will issue findings and recommendations for dismissal of this action; Clerk to this order on Jennifer Johnson at 29 Frey Place, Vallejo, CA 94590. (Benson, A)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/20/2015 ORDERING the defendants to file proofs of service of a suggestion of death upon Frederick Marceles Cooley, Jr. and Jennifer Johnson within fourteen days; ORDERING that any Motion for Subst itution by Frederich Marceles Cooley, Jr., accompanied by a Motion to Appoint a Guardian Ad Litem, be filed by a licensed attorney within ninety days of the service of the aforementioned suggestion of death; CAUTIONING that the failure to file a timely Motion for Substitution will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve a copy of this order on Jennifer Johnson at 29 Frey Place, Vallejo, CA 94590. (Michel, G.)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 18 Motion to substitute signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/9/15. (Kaminski, H)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/28/15: HEARING as to 18 MOTION for Substitution RESET for 8/26/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Kaminski, H)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/23/15 ORDERING that Mr. Cooley's 13 motion to substitute is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff has until 7/24/15, to file an amended motion for substitution. (Kastilahn, A)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/23/2015 ORDERING the plaintiff's successor or representative to file a Motion for Substitution within 90 days; WARNING the plaintiff's successor or representative that the court will dismiss this action if a Motion for Substitution is not filed within 90 days of the filing of the 11 Statement of Death filed on 4/23/2015 [see F.R.Cv.P. Rile 25(a)]; VACATING the Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2015. (Michel, G.)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/16/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is GRANTED. Service is appropriate for the following defendants: The City of Vallejo, Dustin Joseph and D avid McLaughlin. The Clerk is directed to issue forthwith, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve within ninety days of the date of this order, all process pursuant to FRCP 4, including a copy of this Court's status order, without prepayme nt of costs. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff one USM-285 form for each defendant, one summons, a copy of the complaint, an appropriate form for consent to trial by a Magistrate Judge and this Court's Status Order. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal, 501 I Street, Sacramento, Ca., 95814, Tel. No. (916) 930-2030.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooley v. City of Vallejo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Marceles Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Represented By: Furah Z. Faruqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Joseph
Represented By: Furah Z. Faruqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McLaughlin
Represented By: Furah Z. Faruqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?