Green v. CDCR et al
Plaintiff: Warren C. Green
Defendant: CDCR, CHCF, T. Bzoskie and A. Adams
Case Number: 2:2014cv02854
Filed: December 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/08/19 ORDERING the Clerk of Court is directed to designate plaintiffs document filed September 18,2019, 75 , as Additional Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for S ummary Judgment. In response to plaintiffs Notice filed October 2, 2019, 78 , the court directs defense counsel, Deputy Attorney General James Mathison, in consultation with appropriate CDCR staff, to file and serve a statement within 14 days that identifies the location(s) of plaintiffs legal files and, if still applicable, CDCRs plans to deliver the files to plaintiff.(Plummer, M) Modified on 10/9/2019 (Plummer, M).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/03/19 ORDERING that on or before 9/27/19, plaintiff shall file and serve an opposition, if any, to defendants' motion for summary judgment. (Plummer, M)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/27/19 GRANTING 66 Motion for extension of time. The dispositive motion deadline in this case is extended to Friday 8/16/19. (Plummer, M)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/15/19 ORDERING the deadline for filing dispositive motions in this case is extended to 7/12/19. (Plummer, M)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/06/19 ORDERING by separate orders filed February 1, 2019, this action is set for a settlement conference on April 11, 2019. See ECF Nos. 59 , 60 . Plaintiff should follow the directions in those orders concerning the submission of his confidential settlement statement and attendance at the settlement conference. (Plummer, M)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/31/2019 ORDERING the custodian to produce Warren C. Green T-09147, to testify in USDC at 1:00 p.m. on 4/11/2019 in courtroom 24, before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. (cc: CKD, OTCD-SAC) (Yin, K)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/12/2018 CONSTRUING 57 Defendants' request as a Renewed Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Deposition and For Sanctions and ORDERING Clerk to designate it as such on the docket; GRANTING 57 Motion to compel Plaintiff's Deposition; and DENYING without prejudice 67 Motion for Monetary Sanctions. Defendants to inform Plaintiff of his rescheduled deposition at least 14 days in advance. (Henshaw, R)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/28/18 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 6/22/18 51 are ADOPTED in full; Defendants' Motion to revoke Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status, 39 , is DENIED; and Plaintiff is permitted to proceed in forma pauperis in this action. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/21/18 RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion to revoke plaintiff's in forma pauperis status 39 be denied. and plaintiff be permitted to proceed in this action in forma pauperis. Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's IFP 39 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/16/18 DENYING 48 , 49 Motions for Discovery. Discovery is stayed, and the current deadline for filing dispositive motions (August 17,2018) is VACATED, pending further order of this court. (Plummer, M) Modified on 5/17/2018 (Plummer, M).
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/01/18 ORDERING plaintiff shall within 21 days after the filing date of this order, file and serve an opposition or statement of non-opposition to defendants' pending motion to revoke plaintiff's in forma pauperis status. (Plummer, M)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF APPOINTED COUNSEL signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/12/2017 ORDERING reimbursement of Ikonte's judicially-approved expenses which comply with the other limits of the policy (cc: Finance)(Washington, S) Modified on 12/12/2017 (Washington, S).
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/24/2017 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel Chijioke O. Ikonte is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER APPOINTING LIMITED PURPOSE COUNSEL signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/18/2017 APPOINTING Chijioke O. Ikonte as counsel in the above entitled matter for limited purpose of filing an amended complaint. The amended complaint is due ninet y days from the date of this Order. Chijioke O. Ikonte's appointment will terminate when Plaintiff's amended complaint is filed, or files a notice that an amended complaint would not be appropriate.(Washington, S) Modified on 4/19/2017 (Washington, S).
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DECLINING ADOPT 20 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/30/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 17 Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; this matter is REFERRED to Sujean Park, Program Director of the Pro Bono Program of the Eastern District of California, to seek voluntary counsel to represent Plaintiff in this action (cc: Sujean Park). (Benson, A)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/19/2016 DENYING plaintiff's 18 request for appointment of counsel. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed without prejudice; and the Clerk shall close this case. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Yin, K)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/13/2015 ORDERING plaintiff to, within 30 days, complete and return the Notice of Amendment, with the required documents. The Clerk shall send plaintiff, together with this order, the following: (a) A blank form for filing a civil rights complaint; (b) A copy of plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and attached exhibits, ECF No. 9; (c) A copy of plaintiff's recent filing entitled on the docket as a Response, ECF No. 14; and (d) A copy of this court's order filed 9/29/2015, ECF No. 11.(Yin, K)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Warren C. Green signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/29/15. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/19/14 ordering plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the SACRAMENTO Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/8/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. CDCR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren C. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHCF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Bzoskie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?