Brandon v. Williams, et al.
Plaintiff: Kaian Brandon
Defendant: L. Williams, A. Muhammad, T. Busig, S. Mitchell and W. Hendricks
Case Number: 2:2014cv02883
Filed: December 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 2/17/2021 GRANTING 92 Motion for Attendance of Incarcerated Witness Gregory Norwood. (Henshaw, R)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/14/20 ORDERING the Custodian to produce by Zoom Video Conference Kaian Brandon on 10/13/20 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Ken dall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk of court shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept, Sacramento and KJN) (Plummer, M)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 7/10/2020 SETTING a Settlement Conference for 10/13/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The parties shall exchange non-confidential settlement statements 7 days prior to the settlement conference. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on the Calipatria State Prison Litigation Office via fax. (cc: ADR, KJN) (Yin, K)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 2/12/20 DENYING 85 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 09/24/19 ORDERING plaintiff's status report shall be filed and served within 30 days from the date of service of this order. Defendants' status report shall be filed within 30 days after service of plaintiff's status report. The clerk of the court is directed to mail to all parties the form "Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge," together with the instant order. (Plummer, M)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/3/19 ADOPTING in full 64 the findings and recommendations. Plaintiff's 49 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED and Defendants' 39 , 45 Cross Motions for Summary Judgment are DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Discharging Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Inmate Kaian Brandon, CDCR #AE-0690, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/12/19. (Gonzalez, R)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 5/15/2019 ORDERING the custodian to produce Kaian Brandon #AE-0690, to testify at California State Prison, Corcoran on 7/12/2019, at 8:30 a.m., before a Magistrate Judge; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. (cc: ADR; OTCD-SAC) (Yin, K)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/31/2019 RECOMMENDING plaintiff's 49 motion for summary judgment be denied; and the, 39 , 45 cross motions for summary judgment by defendants Hendricks, Busig, Williams, Mitchell, and Muhammad be denied. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/29/2018 GRANTING 61 Motion for Extension of Time, 62 Reply Brief is deemed timely, and 39 , 45 , and 49 Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment, which are now fully briefed, will be addressed separately. (Huang, H)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/3/18 GRANTING 58 Motion for Extension. Defendants shall file a reply to plaintiff's opposition by 10/16/18. (Coll, A)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/29/2018 GRANTING 38 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Motion for Summary Adjudication; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to separately file the proposed amended motion for summary judgment attach ed to plaintiff's 38 motion as an amended motion for summary adjudication filed as of 8/6/2018; DISREGARDING 31 original motion for summary adjudication as superseded by the amended motion and the Clerk to terminate 31 as a pending motion; and ORDERING Defendants may file new oppositions to plaintiff's amended motion within 30 days of the date of this order and plaintiff may file his replies within 30 days after service of defendants' opposition briefs. (Henshaw, R)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/13/2018 GRANTING 42 Request for Extension of Time. Defendants granted 7 days extension of time, through and including 8/21/2018, to file their pre-trial motion. (Henshaw, R)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING 24 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 09/28/17 DENYING the 16 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants shall file an answer to plaintiff' complaint within 30 days; the matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. (Benson, A.)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/31/17 recommending that defendants' motion to dismiss 16 be denied. MOTION to DISMISS 16 referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/15/15 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 5 is granted; Plaintiff is required to pay the full statutory filing fee of $350. 00 for this action. The director of the CDC shall collect from plaintiffs inmate trust account an initial partial filing fee and shall forward the amount to the Clerk of the Court, such payment to be clearly identified by the name and number assigne d to this action; Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the address shown above; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandon v. Williams, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaian Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Busig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?