Vining v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tad Osborne Vining
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2014cv02977
Filed: December 26, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/8/17: Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees in the amount of $2,855.23 under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. §2412(d) and no award of costs. (Kaminski, H)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/9/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff' 15 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART; Defendant's 19 cross-motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART; The Commissioner's decision is REVERSED; and this matter is REMENDED for further proceedings consistent with this order. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/18/2015 ORDERING the Commissioner of Social Security to respond to the 15 Motion for Summary Judgment by 12/14/2015. (Michel, G.)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/13/2015 GRANTING plaintiff's 3 application to proceed IFP; the Clerk shall issue process and serve upon plaintiff Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd's Scheduling Order and Order re Consent or Request for Reassignment for social security cases; the Clerk shall also serve a copy of this order upon the United States Marshal. (cc: USM)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vining v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tad Osborne Vining
Represented By: Jesse S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?