Mulgrew v. Green Tree Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Mulgrew, Jr.
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC and Green Tree Lending, Inc
Case Number: 2:2014cv02998
Filed: December 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/22/2016 RECOMMENDING that the Defendant's 19 motion to dismiss be granted; Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed without leave to amend; and the clerk is directed to enter judgment and close the case. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England; Objections are due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Jackson, T)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying plaintiff's 23 Motion for Default Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/20/16. (Kastilahn, A)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/8/16 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS issued 10/22/15 12 are VACATED; Plaintiff's MOTION to vacate the order for dismissal 13 is GRANTED to the extent that the recommendat ion for dismissal is vacated; the Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of the order authorizing service (Doc. 8 ), a new summons, a USM-285 form, a copy of the complaint, and new case documents; and Plaintiff is required to effect service of process either through the USM or on his own pursuant to FRCP 4, as set forth above. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/21/15 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules andorders. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/21/2015 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall issue a summons in a civil case, the undersigned's new case documents, and an or der setting this matter for an initial scheduling conference. The Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff the summons, a USM-285 form, and a copy of the complaint. Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete the summons by indicating the addresses of the named defendants and shall submit to the United States Marshal. Within 20 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a notice indicating that the documents described above have been submitted to the United States Marshal. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mulgrew v. Green Tree Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Mulgrew, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Lending, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?