United States of America v. Approximately $4,100.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $4,100.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2014mc00071
Filed: May 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/15/15: The deadline by which the United States shall file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture is extended to October 19, 2015.(Kaminski, H)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER 11 for extension of time signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/15/2015. The United States shall file a Complaint for Forfeiture against defendant currency by 7/20/2015. (Marciel, M)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/20/2015 ORDERING the United States to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture by 4/20/2015. (Michel, G)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/24/2014 ORDERING the deadline for the United States to file a complaint for forfeiture is EXTENDED to 1/20/2015. (Donati, J)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/29/2014 ORDERING 5 that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be EXTENDED to 12/5/2014. (Reader, L)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/3/14 ORDERING, the parties agree that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be extended to October 6, 2014. (Becknal, R)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/6/2014 ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be extended to 7/7/2014. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $4,100.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $4,100.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?