United States of America v. Approximately $63,176.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $63,176.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2014mc00087
Filed: June 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/16/15. CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/09/15 ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be EXTENDED to 02/05/16. (Benson, A)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/28/15: The deadline by which the United States shall required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment shall be extended to November 9, 2015. (Kaminski, H)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/10/15: The deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be extended to August 11, 2015. (Kaminski, H)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/15/15 ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be extended to June 12, 2015. (Becknal, R)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/10/15. The time to file a complaint for forfeiture and/or to obtain an indictment is extended to 4/13/15. (Manzer, C)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER 9 for extension of time signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/14/2015. Parties agree the deadline to file a Complaint for Forfeiture against defendant currency and/or to obtain an Indictment alleging defendant currency is subject to Forfeiture shall be EXTENDED to 3/13/2015. (Marciel, M)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER 7 for extension of time signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/18/2014. Parties agree that deadlin by which United States is required to file a Complaint for Forfeiture and/or obtain an Indictment alleging defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be EXTENDED to 1/12/2015. (Marciel, M)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/14/2014 ORDERING the deadline to file a complaint is EXTENDED to 11/13/2014. Suzan Yee, attorney for claimant, is NOT ADMITTED in the Eastern District of California. Attorney Yee may not sign further documents until admitted to practice in CAED. (Donati, J)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/13/14. Time to file a complaint for forfeiture and/or to obtain an indictment alleging forfeiture is extended to 10/14/14. (Manzer, C)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/24/14. Time to file a complaint for forfeiture and/or to obtain an indictment alleging forfeiture is extended to 8/15/14. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $63,176.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $63,176.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?