United States of America v. Approximately $108,341.20 seized from Tri Counties Bank Account Number 461021608
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $108,341.20 seized from Tri Counties Bank Account Number 461021608
Claimant: Houssam Ataya
Case Number: 2:2014mc00128
Filed: October 31, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE, signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/2/15. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/1/2015 ORDERING the United States to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant funds and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant funds are subject to forfeiture by 7/3/2015. (Michel, G.)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION and ORDER extending time to file a complaint for forfeiture and/or obtain an indictment to 5/4/15 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/2/15. (Manzer, C)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/31/2014 ORDERING the United States to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant funds and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant funds are subject to forfeiture by 2/3/2015. (Michel, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $108,341.20 seized from Tri Counties Bank Account Number 461021608
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $108,341.20 seized from Tri Counties Bank Account Number 461021608
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Houssam Ataya
Represented By: Patrick Keith Hanly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?