Maxwell v. Mitchell et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Paul Maxwell
Defendant: Ryon Mitchell, Kevin Hass and City of Chico
Case Number: 2:2015cv00015
Filed: January 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 05/23/19 ORDERING that plaintiff shall promptly seek additional information sufficient to effect service on any unserved defendants and notify the court once such information is ascertained. (Plummer, M)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/6/18 DENYING 29 Motion for Extension. (Coll, A)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/30/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/29/2018 ADOPTING 25 findings and recommendations in full. Greeson, County of Butte, and the Butte County Superior Court are DISMISSED as defendants to this action. (Zignago, K.)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/11/2018 GRANTING 26 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff to submit service documents and objections to 25 Findings and Recommendations within 30 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 09/13/18 RECOMMENDING that Greeson, County of Butte, and Butte County Superior Court be dismissed as defendants to this action. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/30/18 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court is directed to randomly assign a District Judge and to update the docket to reflect the new case number. U.S. District Judge John A. Mendez randomly assigned to this action. The new case number is 2:15-cv-0015 JAM CMK (PC). (Plummer, M)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/11/2016 GRANTING plaintiff's 17 motion to proceed IFP and 18 motion for an extension of time; and the first amended complaint filed 8/26/2016 is deemed timely. (Yin, K)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 02/23/16 ordering the court authorizes service on the following defendants: Mitchell and Hass. The clerk of the court shall issue a summons in a civil case and send plaintiff the summons along w ith a copy of the complaint. Plaintiff shall effect service of process with the court within the time provided in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m); and within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall show cause in writing why the City of Chico should not be dismissed as a defendant to this action. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell v. Mitchell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Paul Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryon Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Hass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?