DuShane v. Sacramento County Main Jail et al
Plaintiff: Jasen Lynn DuShane
Defendant: Sacramento County Main Jail and Her
Case Number: 2:2015cv00136
Filed: January 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT and DISPOSITION signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/26/2016 ORDERING all pending deadlines set in this matter are VACATED. It is further ORDERED that dispositional documents shall be filed no later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Yin, K)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/4/16 ORDERING that Plaintiffs time to file his opposition to Defendants motion for summary judgment may be extended by 28 days, up to and including May 5, 2016, and that Defe ndants time to file any reply to Plaintiffs opposition may be extended by 28 days, up to and including May 19, 2016. There has been one previous stipulation for an extension of 28 days 63 , when Plaintiff was still proceeding in pro per.(Dillon, M)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/23/2016 DENYING plaintiff's 47 motion for sanctions. (Yin, K)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/7/16 ORDERING that the parties request to extend the deadlines for Plaintiff to file his opposition and Defendants to file their reply to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgme nt/Adjudication is granted. The parties request the deadline for Plaintiff to file his opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication (ECF 58 ) is extended four weeks from the current deadline of March 10, 2016. Further, the parties request the deadline for Defendants reply be extended four weeks from the current deadline of March 24, 2016.(Dillon, M)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/4/16 GRANTING 53 Motion for Extension of time. Defendant Her shall file her dispositive motion on or before February 18, 2016.(Dillon, M)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/10/15 ordering that the actions denominated 2:15-cv-136 TLN CKD P and 2:15-cv-2319 CKD P, and the same hereby are reassigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings. Henceforth the captions on all documents filed in these reassigned cases shall be shown as 2:15-cv-0136 TLN EFB P or 2:15-cv-2319 TLN EFB P. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (cc: CKD)(Plummer, M)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/4/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 11/9/15 Request for Reconsideration 40 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 42 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/30/15. (Plummer, M)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/02/15 ordering plaintiff's motion for order pursuant to all writs act 33 and motion in support of proposed order 35 are denied without prejudice to renewal in the future if plaintiff is denied supplies such as envelopes and paper, to pursue this action. The clerk of the court is directed to serve this order upon Warden Isidro Baca, Northern Nevada Correctional Center, PO Box 7000, Carson City, NV 89702. (Plummer, M)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/7/2015 ORDERING that within 21 days, the Warden at the Northern Nevada Correctional Center shall indicate in writing whether plaintiff is provided with paper, envelopes, writing instrumen ts, postage and copy services so that plaintiff may adequately communicate with this court and file necessary documents in this action. If plaintiff is not being provided with these items, the Warden must indicate why not. The Clerk shall serve this order upon Warden Isidro Baca, Northern Nevada Correctional Center.(Yin, K)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/14/15 ORDERING that 29 Motion is DENIED without prejudice to plaintiff filing another request in which plaintiff clarifies exactly what he believes he needs. (Dillon, M)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/6/2015 DENYING plaintiff's 19 Motion for Reconsideration and AFFIRMING Magistrate Judge Delaney's 5/12/2015 17 Order denying Motion to Extend prison copy work limit". (Marciel, M)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/8/2015 ORDERING that defendant Her is not in default and plaintiff's 20 motion is DENIED. (Yin, K)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/31/15 ADOPTING IN FULL 7 Findings and Recommendations; The Sacramento County Main Jail is DISMISSED as a Defendant in this case. Sacramento County Main Jail terminated. (Meuleman, A)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/13/15 ORDERING that 6 Motion is DENIED.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DuShane v. Sacramento County Main Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasen Lynn DuShane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Main Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Her
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?