Cushman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Brenda L Cushman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv00139
Filed: January 16, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/17/2015 DISMISSING this matter with prejudice; ORDERING each party to bear its own fees, costs, and expenses. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 07/02/15 ORDERING that the date for Plaintiff to file a Opening Brief is EXTENDED to 08/17/15, with all other dates in the Court's Order Concerning Review Of Social Security Cases extended accordingly. (Benson, A)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/28/2015 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to issue all necessary process. Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit all documents necessary to effectuate service to the USM. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cushman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda L Cushman
Represented By: Brian C. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Represented By: Heather Moss, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?