Johnson v. San et al
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Sopheak M San and Edward E Overton
Case Number: 2:2015cv00162
Filed: January 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/13/2017 VACATING 11/15/17 Debtor Examination RE: Enforcement of Judgment of Sopheak M. San. (York, M)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/21/17 ORDERING that a Judgment Debtor Exam is SET for Sopheak M. San on 11/15/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Benson, A.)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/25/2016 ORDERING Sopheak M. San to appear on 8/3/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Zignago, K.)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER adopting 11 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting 8 Motion for Default Judgment signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/18/16. The Clerk is directed to close the case. (Kaminski, H)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/13/15. RECOMMENDING that: recommending that plaintiff's 8 application for default judgment be granted; that plaintiff be awarded statutory damages in the amount of $8,000; that plaintiff be granted an injunction requiring defendant San to provide for the correct number and type of properly configured disabled parking space(s) including a van accessible disabled parking space; that plaintiff's re quest for voluntary dismissal of the claims against defendant Edward Overton and of negligence and California Disabled Persons Act claims against defendant San be granted and those claims be dismissed without prejudice; and that plaintiff be awarded costs and attorney's fees in the amount of $3,200. Referred to Judge John A. Medez; Objections to these F&Rs due within 14 days. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. San et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Mark D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sopheak M San
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward E Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?