Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc. v. Tiger Lines, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc.
Defendant: Tiger Lines, LLC and Group & Pension Administrators, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00319
Filed: February 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/4/2020 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/21/19. (Becknal, R)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/25/19 ORDERING that Non-expert discovery is reopened until March 7, 2019 for the limited purpose of permitting plaintiff to obtain written discovery responses from defendants and for plaintiff to conduct a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of defendants. In all other respects, non-expert discovery is closed. No later than February 14, 2019, defendants shall provide complete responses to all of plaintiff's outstanding written di scovery. The parties shall promptly meet and confer regarding a date for plaintiff to take defendants' Rule 30(b) (6) deposition, which is envisioned to take place in the next approximately 30 days. Further case deadlines as outlined in the supplemental pretrial scheduling order 32 shall track the new March 7, 2019 deadline for closing of all non-expert discovery. (Kaminski, H)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/6/2018 ORDERING the discovery cut off date in this action shall be CONTINUED to 12/24/2018. All other dates shall be set pursuant to the Court's Supplemental Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Washington, S)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/24/2017 GRANTING 29 Stipulation to Allow Plaintiff to File a Third Amended Complaint; ORDERING Plaintiff Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc. to file its Third Amended Complaint within five (5) days; ORDERING the defendants to respond to said complaint within the statutorily required timeframe. (Michel, G.)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/12/2016 GRANTING 16 Motion to Dismiss to the extent it asks that the plaintiff be required to provide a more definite statement of its claims in accordance with Rule 12(e); DENYING 16 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice to being renewed should the plaintiff's further effort to amend prove unavailing; GRANTING the plaintiff thirty (30) days to file an Second Amended Complaint. (Michel, G.)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/20/2015. Plaintiff's 8 Motion to Remand is DENIED and defendants' 5 Motion to Dismiss Action is GRANTED. Not later than 20 days following date Memorandum and Order is electronically filed, plaintiff may, but is not required to, file an Amended Complaint. If no Amended Complaint is timely filed, this case will be dismissed with prejudice upon no further Notice to parties. (Marciel, M)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 4/9/15 ORDERING that the deadlines for the parties to confer and submit their Joint Status Report are hereby continued pending the Court's ruling on Defendant's Motion To Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. The Court will set new dates, if appropriate, for the parties to confer and submit a Joint Status Report upon issuing its ruling on the pending motions. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc. v. Tiger Lines, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Robinson
Represented By: Joy Young Stephenson
Represented By: Barry Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger Lines, LLC
Represented By: Elise D. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group & Pension Administrators, Inc.
Represented By: Elise D. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?