Kang v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sinesha V. Kang
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv00335
Filed: February 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/14/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff is AWARDED attorney fees under the Equal access to Justice Act (EAJA), in the amount of $5,000.00. (Kastilahn, A)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/11/2017 GRANTING 17 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 18 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The Commissioner's decision is reversed. This matter is remanded for further proceedings consistent with this order. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/18/2015 ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Motion for Summary Judgment by 12/11/2015. (Michel, G.)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/4/2015 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue process and to serve upon plaintiff the undersigned's Scheduling Order and Order re Consent or Request for Reassignment for social security cases; The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order upon the United States Marshal; Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM a complete d summons, a completed USM-285 form, sufficient copies of the summons and complaint for service of process, and sufficient copies of the Scheduling Order and Order re Consent or Request for Reassignment issued in this case; within 5 days after submitting the necessary documents to the USM for service or process, plaintiff shall file in this court a declaration stating the date on which the documents were submitted to the USM. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kang v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sinesha V. Kang
Represented By: Bess M. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?