Pena v. Frauenheim
Petitioner: Mario Pena
Respondent: Scott Frauenheim
Case Number: 2:2015cv00416
Filed: February 23, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/1/2021 ADOPTING IN FULL 13 Findings and Recommendations. This action is DISMISSED and The Court DECLINES to issue the Certificate of Appealability. (Tupolo, A)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/25/21 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days.(Plummer, M)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/29/2020 ORDERING petitioner to show cause within 21 days why this action should not be dismissed. Failure to respond to this order will result in a recommendation that this matter be dismissed. (Yin, K)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/13/2015 GRANTING petitioner's 9 request to proceed IFP; petitioner's 1 request that this matter be stayed is GRANTED; this matter is STAYED; the Clerk shall administrativey close this case; and petitioner shall inform the court when he has exhausted state court remedies with respect to all of the claims presented in his petition for writ of habeas corpus. (Yin, K)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/6/15 ORDERING that Petitioner shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee; Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pena v. Frauenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mario Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Frauenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?