Abella v. Biter
Petitioner: Frank Abella
Respondent: M. D. Biter
Case Number: 2:2015cv00424
Filed: February 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM DECISION signed by Senior Judge James K. Singleton on 9/14/17, ORDERING that the Petition under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for Writof Habeas Corpus is DENIED. The Court DECLINES to issue a Certificate of Appealability. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/01/16 ordering that petitioner shall file a traverse, if any, within 30 days from the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/7/2015 DENYING without prejudice petitioner's 24 motion for a stay. Petitioner is relieved of his obligation to file a traverse pending further order of the court. Petitioner is gran ted leave to renew his motion for stay on or before 2/26/2016. Any stipulation that this action be stayed pending resolution of petitioner's request for re-sentencing in the Sacramento County Superior Court may be submitted on or before 1/20/2016. (Yin, K)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/18/15 ORDERING that Petitioner's motion 16 and respondent's requests 17 are granted; Respondent is directed to file a response to petitioner's habeas petition within sixty days from the date of this order. (Dillon, M)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/27/15 ORDERING that petitioners motions for appointment of counsel (ECF Nos. 9 & 11 ) are denied without prejudice. (Dillon, M)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the SACRAMENTO Division of the Eastern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/24/15. New Case Number 2:15-cv-00424 KJN (HC). Old Case Number 1:15-cv-00268 MJS (HC). (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abella v. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frank Abella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M. D. Biter
Represented By: Brian George Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?