Glynn v. City of Stockton
Plaintiff: Jessica Glynn
Defendant: City of Stockton
Case Number: 2:2015cv00529
Filed: March 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 REPLY from Court to 153 Jury Note signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/15/2017. (Zignago, K.)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/2/2017. (Reader, L)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/11/2017 GRANTING in PART and DENYING in PART 52 Motion for Sanctions. GRANTING that defendant may not use these documents or new information contained in the documents at trial. The court DENI ES plaintiff's requests that the court inform the jury of defendant's late disclosure and DENIES plaintiff's requests that the court order defendant to conduct a further search of its records. The court DENIES plaintiff's request to grant her attorney's fees. (Washington, S)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/12/2016 ORDERING that defendant's motion to exclude Matt Lam's testimony is DENIED without prejudice, as governed by the court's Final Pretrial Order. (Zignago, K.)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/14/2016 ORDERING the plaintiff to produce any additional/supplemental documentation on wage loss mitigation by 10/31/2016; ORDERING the parties to file and serve any supplemenatal expert report(s) by their previously disclosed expert(s) by 11/10/2016; ORDERING that supplemental expert discovery be completed by 11/30/2016; ORDERING the parties to supplement their Trial Exhibit Lists by 12/9/2016. (Michel, G.)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/21/16 ORDERING that the parties shall submit to the court by 10/21/2016, a stipulation andproposed order addressing any supplementation by Mr. Enos. A Settlement Conference is SET for 11/8/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The court shall hear arguments regarding any of the above motions the parties wish decided before trial on 10/7/2016. Any motion a party wants heard on that day shall be briefed in a maximum of five pages per motion, filed by 9/28/2016. Any opposition shall be filed by 10/4/2016, with replies argued at hearing. Jury Trial is SET for 1/30/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Jud ge Kimberly J. Mueller. Trial briefs are due on 1/13/2017. Plaintiff's motion for sanctions and attorney's fees is scheduled for hearing on 10/7/2016. Each party is granted 14 days from the date of this order to file objections to the same. (Kastilahn, A)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/25/16. (Kastilahn, A)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/2/2016 GRANTING 15 Motion to Amend the Complaint; ORDERING the plaintiff to file the proposed first amended complaint as soon as practicable; ORDERING Defendant City of Stockton to respond to the first amended complaint within 30 days. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glynn v. City of Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Glynn
Represented By: Gary R. Basham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Stockton
Represented By: Ted Daniel Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?