Elliott v. SSA
Plaintiff: Amy F. Elliott
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv00569
Filed: March 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/17/2016 DENYING 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; the Commissioner's 19 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; the final decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is AFFIRMED and judgment is entered for the Commissioner; the Clerk if Court shall close this case. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/24/15 ORDERING that the time for Defendant to file her Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment be EXTENDED for 30 days until 12/21/2015.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/21/2015 ORDERING the deadline for plaintiff to file her Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 10/21/2015. (Donati, J)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/13/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Request to Proceed IFP 3 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to serve the scheduling order in Social Security cases. The Clerk is further directed to serv e a copy of this order on the USM. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall submit to the USM an original and five copies of the completed summons, five copies of the complaint, five copies of the scheduling order, an d a completed USM-285 form, and shall file a statement with the court that such documents have been submitted to the USM. The USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty (60) days from the date of this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy F. Elliott
Represented By: Jared Thomas Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?