Peters v. Beard
Petitioner: Shane Austin Peters
Respondent: Jeffrey A. Beard
Case Number: 2:2015cv00586
Filed: March 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Senior Judge James K. Singleton on 12/19/17 GRANTING 30 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Court appoints Attorney Richard V. Myers to represent Peters on appeal. (Kaminski, H)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM DECISION signed by Senior Judge James K. Singleton on 12/7/17 ORDERING that the Petition under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Court issues a Certificate of Appealability with respect to Peters' claim. The Clerk of the Court is to enter judgment accordingly. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Senior Judge James K. Singleton on 10/26/2017 GRANTING 23 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent may have until 11/16/2017 in which to file a memorandum discussing the impact, if any, of the California Supreme Courts decision in People v. Sanchez, 374 P.3d 320 (Cal. 2016) on this case. (Hunt, G)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Senior Judge James K. Singleton on 10/25/2017 ORDERING that the state court reporter's transcripts of in camera proceedings held on 8/10/2010 and 10/1/2010 be filed under seal for the duration of the proceedings. (Washington, S) Modified on 10/25/2017 (Washington, S).
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Senior Judge James K. Singleton on 09/26/17 ORDERING that, by 10/26/17, the parties are DIRECTED to submit a memorandum no greater than 15 pages in length discussing the impact, if any, of the California Supreme Court's decision in People v. Sanchez, 374 P.3d 320 (Cal. 2016). By 10/26/17, Respondent is DIRECTED to lodge with the Court the sealed transcripts of the in camera hearings or a filing that indicates where in the record the transcripts may be found. (Benson, A.)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/29/15 DENYING without prejudice 16 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shane Austin Peters
Represented By: Richard V Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey A. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?