Clark v. Feinberg et al
Plaintiff: Robert Clark
Defendant: Bennett Feinberg, J. Lewis, Lawrence C. Fong and Paramvir S. Shohota
Case Number: 2:2015cv00613
Filed: March 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/22/17: This appeal is not frivolous or taken in bad faith. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Pro Se Unit at the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (Kaminski, H)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/2/2017 DISREGARDING plaintiff's 21 , 22 motions. The Clerk shall terminate these matters as pending motions. Any further filings in this closed case will be disregarded without additional order. (Yin, K)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/11/2016 DENYING plaintiff's 13 motion, as this case is now closed. (Yin, K)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/23/2016 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed for failure to state a claim. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/25/15 GRANTING plaintiff's 2 application to proceed IFP; ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Robert Clar k and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Feinberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennett Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence C. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramvir S. Shohota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?