Marks v. Frauenheim
Petitioner: Michael Marks
Respondent: Scott Frauenheim
Case Number: 2:2015cv00665
Filed: March 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/24/18 ADOPTING the findings and recommendations filed July 31, 2018, in full; DENYING Petitioner's motion for a certificate of appealability (ECF No. 36 ); and DECLINING to issue the certificate of appealability referenced in 28 U.S.C. § 2253. (Becknal, R)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/30/18 RECOMMENDING that petitioner's motion for a certificate of appealability 36 be construed as a rule 59(e) motion and be denied. Motion 36 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/11/2017 DENYING petitioner's 29 request for the appointment of counsel. IT IS RECOMMENDED that petitioner's 28 motion for a stay be denied as moot; petitioner's 29 request for an evidentiary hearing be denied; and petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/30/2017 ORDERING petitioner's 21 , 24 motions for appointment of counsel are DENIED without prejudice; petitioner's 24 motion for an evidentiary hearing is DENIED without prejudice as premature. (Yin, K)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/01/15 denying 1 request to stay in state to exhaust all claims. Petitioner is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file a petition. The clerk of the court is directed to send petitioner the court's form for filing a petition for writ of habeas corpus and the application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marks v. Frauenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Frauenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?