Ouapou-Lena v. Greenfield Care Center of Fairfield et al
Plaintiff: Fabienne Ouapou-Lena
Defendant: Greenfield Care Center of Fairfield and Eva Care Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv00721
Filed: April 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/29/17 ORDERING Plaintiff and Defendants through their counsel of record, hereby stipulate and agree to the dismissal with prejudice of this action, in its entirety as to all parties and all claims for relief in Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), with each party to bear its own respective attorneys' fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/22/2017 GRANTING in part and DENTING in part 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's causes of action for: Race Discrimination in Violation of 42 U.S.C. § 2000 e et. seq.; Wrongful Termination Breach of Implied Contract of Continued Employment; Breach of Implied Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing; Wrongful Termination in Violation of Public Policy; and Unfair, Unlawful, Deceptive Business Practices in Violation of Business and Professions Code § 17200 et. seq., because Plaintiff failed to submit sufficient evidence to show a genuine issue of material fact as to any of these causes of action. Motion is DENIED as to Plaintiffs cause of action for Defamation Slander because Plaintiff has submitted sufficient evidence to show a genuine issue of material fact as this cause of action. (Washington, S)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/09/2016 ORDERING that the deadlines, hearing dates and conference dates currently set in this matter are continued as follows: Dispositive Motions filed by 12/13/2016; Dispositive Mo tion Hearing date shall be 01/20/2017 at 1:30 PM; a Joint Pretrial Statement shall be filed by 02/17/2017; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez; Jury Trial set for 4/3/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Butolph, J)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/6/2016 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall have until 10/31/2016 to take the deposition of Defendants' CEO and Vice President John Padama. (Reader, L)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATUS (Pre-trial Scheduling) ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/9/15 ORDERING that all dispositive motions shall be filed by 11/16/2016. Hearing on such motions shall be on 12/14/2016 at 9:30 a.m.. All discovery shall be completed by 10/14/2 016. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 8/12/2016. Supplemental disclosure and disclosure of any rebuttal experts due by 8/19/2016. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 1/20/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. The Jury Trial is SET for 2/27/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. The parties estimate a trial length of approximately 5 to 7 days. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ouapou-Lena v. Greenfield Care Center of Fairfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabienne Ouapou-Lena
Represented By: Samuel Barry Rudolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenfield Care Center of Fairfield
Represented By: John H. Adams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Care Group, LLC
Represented By: John H. Adams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?