Iegorova v. HUD
Plaintiff: Liudmyla Iegorova
Defendant: H.U.D.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00726
Filed: April 1, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/26/15 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) and to vacate all dates and close this case. Case referred to Judge Kimberly J. Meuller; Objections to these F&Rs due within 14 days. (Benson, A)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/21/2015 ORDERING the plaintiff to pay to the Clerk of Court within 28 days, $100.00 in monetary sanctions based on the plaintiff's failure to comply with the court's 3 Order and failure to prosecute her case; ORDERING the plaintiff to show cause in writing within 28 days, why this action should not be dismissed pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(b) for failure to comply with the court's 3 Order and failure t o prosecute her case; ORDERING the plaintiff to file a first amended complaint within 28 days, that complies with the court's 3 Order; CAUTIONING the plaintiff that a failure to timely comply with this order will result in a recommendation tha t the action be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(b); ALTERNATIVELY ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of the action without prejudice in lieu of paying the sanctions, responding to the order to show cause, and filing a first amended complaint, as outlined herein; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve another copy of the 3 Order on the plaintiff along with this order. (Michel, G.)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/16/15. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed, but with leave to amend. Within 28 days of this order, plaintiff shall file either (a) a first amended complaint in accordance with the requirements of this order or (b) a notice of voluntary dismissal of the action without prejudice. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iegorova v. HUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liudmyla Iegorova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.U.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?