Benton v. El Dorado County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Benton
Defendant: El Dorado County Sheriff's Department and El Dorado County Correctional Facility
Case Number: 2:2015cv00772
Filed: January 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: El Dorado
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/15/2020 GRANTING in PART 80 Request and DISMISSING this case without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Henshaw, R)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/01/19 DENYING 68 request for copies of court documents. (Plummer, M)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 07/16/19 DENYING 47 , 52 motions for extended time to obtain service information for defendant Clingman; GRANTING 63 plaintiff's request for verification of IFP status; DENYING 46 , 49 ,[5 3], 55 , 59 , 64 , 65 , 66 plaintiff's other motions for court assistance. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff, together with a copy of this order, copies of the undersigned's orders filed on 9/18/18 26 and 5/23/19 45 . (Plummer, M)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/8/2019 ORDERING the "Declaration of Jon Hendrickson in Response to ECF No. 51 " is filed and maintained under seal. Only the Court and the parties are permitted access during the pendency of this litigation and, within 30-days of final judgment or dismissal of this action, the document is to be destroyed by the Court. (Henshaw, R)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/18/2019 ORDERING El Dorado County Sheriff or his designee to file a statement, as described in this order, within 14 days after the filing date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/22/19 DENYING 44 plaintiff's request. (Plummer, M)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/09/19 GRANTING 40 , 41 plaintiff's motions. Within 30 days after service of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the court 1 completed summons, and 1 completed USM-285 form. This court requests that the El Dorado County Sheriff, within 14 days after the filing date of this order, confidentially provide to plaintiff the full name and address of defendant Clingman for purposes of service. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide pla intiff, together with a copy of this order, one blank summons and one blank USM-285 form. The Clerk of Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on El Dorado County Sheriff John DAgostini, 300 Fair Lane, Placerville CA 95667. (Plummer, M)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/01/19 GRANTING 38 Request for verification of this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide plaintiff with a copy of the full docket sheet in this case, together with service of this ord er. The Clerk of Court is further directed to serve a courtesy copy of this order to Correctional Officer Fox, Jail Inmate Services, at the El Dorado County Jail. Plaintiff shall, within 30 days after the filing date of this order, submit to the court the information necessary for the United States Marshal to serve process on sole defendant Clingman. (Plummer, M)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Bruce Benton signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/12/19. The Sheriff of El Dorado County shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of El Dorado County. Clerk to also serve a copy of this order on Financial. (cc: Financial)(Plummer, M)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/22/2019 GRANTING 31 Plaintiff's request to reopen this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to VACATE 28 this Court's order dismissing this case, and the judgment of dismissal 29 . This case is REFERRED back to the assigned magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings. (Reader, L)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/26/18 DIRECTING the clerk to randomly assign a district judge. District Judge Troy L. Nunley added. It is further RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. New Case Number: 2:15-cv-0772-TLN-AC (PC). (Coll, A)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/17/18 GRANTING 17 Motion to Proceed IFP. Within 45 days after service of this order, plaintiff shall: a. complete and return the attached Notice of Election, indicating whether plaintiff inten ds to proceed on his first amended complaint or a proposed second amended complaint; b. if plaintiff seeks to proceed on a proposed second amended complaint, he shall submit the proposed second amended complaint with the notice of election. The foll owing motions are denied as moot: plaintiff's motion for extended time 18 ; plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis as a jail detainee 22 ; and plaintiff's motion for acceptance of an uncertified in forma pauperis application 23 . The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff: a. a copy of this order; b. a copy of plaintiff's first amended complaint 12 ; and c. a copy of this court's screening order 13 .. (Plummer, M)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/08/17 ORDERING within 21 days after the filing date of this order, plaintiff shall complete and file the attached application to proceed in forma pauperis used by non-prisoners in this district. The clerk of court is directed to send plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis used by non-prisoners in this district. (Plummer, M)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/22/17 ORDERING plaintiff may proceed on his First Amended Complaint against El Dorado County Sheriff's Department; or may file a proposed Second Amended Complaint that attempts to add additi onal claims against additional defendants. Within 30 days after service of this order, plaintiff shall: a. Complete and return the attached in forma pauperis application; b. Complete and return the attached Notice of Election, indicating whether pla intiff intends to proceed on his First Amended Complaint or a proposed Second Amended Complaint; c. If plaintiff intends to proceed on a proposed Second Amended Complaint, he shall include his proposed Second Amended Complaint with his other submissi on. The clerk of court is directed to provisionally change plaintiff's address on the docket to the following: Bruce Bention, Inmate, El Dorado County Jail, 300 Forni Road, Placerville, California, 95667. The clerk of court is directed to send plaintiff a) a copy of this order, b) a new application to proceed in forma pauperis, c) a copy of plaintiff's first amended complaint 12 , and d) a copy of the form complaint used by prisoners in this district to pursue a civil rights action. (Plummer, M)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/13/15 ORDERING that the above-identified actions are related. The parties are informed that, although these cases are related under Local Rule 123, they are not consolidated. The Clerk of Court is directed to make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment.(Dillon, M)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 [COPY of ORDER filed in 2:15-cv-0165 AC] ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/8/2015 DENYING the 2 motion to proceed IFP, without prejudice; the claims of plaintiffs Benton, Anderson and Suddeth are SEVERED from the claims of plaint iff Spears; the Clerk shall open 3 separate actions as directed in this order for plaintiffs Benton, Anderson and Suddeth; each plaintiff's original complaint is DISMISSED with leave to file an amended complaint; and each plaintiff has 30 days to file an amended complaint and new ifp application. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benton v. El Dorado County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Dorado County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Dorado County Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?