Williams v. Arnold et al
Plaintiff: |
Lance Williams |
Defendant: |
Eric Arnold, Zueniga, Lieua, Abarca and Chuch |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00782 |
Filed: |
April 10, 2015 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Solano |
Presiding Judge: |
Dale A. Drozd |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 20, 2017 |
Filing
40
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/19/17: The findings and recommendations filed February 6, 2017 35 are adopted in full. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 24 is granted and this case is dismissed without prejudice. (Kaminski, H)
|
February 23, 2017 |
Filing
37
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/17/17 GRANTING 36 Motion for Extension of time. On or before March 10, 2017, plaintiff shall file any objections to the findings and recommendations signed on February 3, 2017.(Dillon, M)
|
February 6, 2017 |
Filing
35
ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/3/2017 ORDERING the Clerk to assign a district judge to this case. IT IS RECOMMENDED that defendants' 24 motion for summary judgment be granted and this case be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
December 30, 2016 |
Filing
34
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/29/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's September 2, 2016 motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 30 ) is DENIED; and defendants' November 14, 2016 motion to modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order 33 is GRANTED. If defendants' summary judgment motion is denied, the court will set new deadlines for discovery and pretrial motions.(Dillon, M)
|
August 18, 2016 |
Filing
29
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/17/2016 DENYING 26 Motion to Stay; GRANTING 26 Motion for Extension of Time; ORDERING the plaintiff to file any response to the 24 Motion for Summary Judgment within sixty (60) days; DENYING 27 Motion for Limited Correspondence. (Michel, G.)
|
October 9, 2015 |
Filing
9
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/08/15 granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. All fees shall be paid in accordance with the court's CDC o rder filed concurrently herewith. Plaintiff's motions to amend 5 and 7 are granted. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff the court's form for filing a civil rights action. (Plummer, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?