Dicey v. Rayner, et al
Plaintiff: Berlan Lynell Dicey
Defendant: C. Rayner, J. Hasty and M. Williams
Case Number: 2:2015cv00927
Filed: April 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/23/2018 GRANTING 50 Motion for Enforcement of Settlement Agreement and DENYING Defendants' Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff to deliver to defendants all documents necessary to effec tuate all the terms of settlement in these cases within 30 days. Defendants to file a stipulation of dismissal within 60 days unless Plaintiff fails to provide defendants with a signed stipulation of dismissal, in which case defendants to inform the court. (Henshaw, R)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/28/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 43 motion to reject the settlement and GRANTING plaintiff an additional 21 days to sign all dispositional documents, including the stipulation of dismissal. C ounsel for defendants shall file the stipulation for dismissal within 30 days. If defendants do not obtain the required documents for dismissal from plaintiff within 21 days, defendants may move for enforcement of the settlement agreement, and any other sanctions appropriate under the law. (cc: KJN) (Yin, K)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/26/2017 ORDERING that within 10 days of the date of this order, Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE for his failure to sign the dispositional documents, including the stipulation for voluntary dismissal, including an explanation of why not if he has not signed the documents. (Henshaw, R)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/31/2017 ORDERING the custodian to produce Berlan Lynell Dicey #P-14277, before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman, by video conference from his present place of confinement, on 6/19/2017, at 9:00 a.m. ; the custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. (cc: KJN, ADR, I.T. Dept.) (Yin, K)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/25/2016 ORDERING that the 21 findings and recommendations are ADOPTED in full. Defendants' 14 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Defendants Hasty and Rayner shall file their answer within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/11/2016 RECOMMENDING that defendants' 14 motion to dismiss be denied; and defendants Hasty and Rayner be ordered to file their answer within 14 days. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/01/16 ordering that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition to the pending motion to dismiss or a statement of non-opposition. (Plummer, M)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING 6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, in full, signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/21/2015. Defendant M. Williams (Correctional Sergeant, High Desert State Prison) is DISMISSED. (Marciel, M)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Berlan Lynell Dicey signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/20/2015. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forw ard to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/11/2015 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, a completed affidavit to proceed ifp; the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application; and plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, a certified trust account statement. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dicey v. Rayner, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berlan Lynell Dicey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Rayner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hasty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?