Hugunin et al v. Rocklin Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hugunin, Patrick Hugunin, D. H., Keith Caldwell, Nicole Hill, X. C., Trishia Pitts, Carl Pitts, N. P., Todd Vrooman, Laura Vrooman, S. V., Richard Rogers, Terrill Rogers, P. R., Michelle Mancour and G. I.
Defendant: Rocklin Unified School District, Sherry McDaniel, Sherry Thibideau, Betty Jo Wessinger, Janna Cambra, Kevin Brown, Roger Stock and Dr. Todd Cutler
Case Number: 2:2015cv00939
Filed: April 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 05/15/18 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' claims and causes of action against all defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice, each side to bear their own attorneys' fees, expenses and costs. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/22/18 GRANTING Plaintiff's AMENDED Motion for order approving Settlement of minor A.E.'s Claims.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/17/2018 GRANTING 154 Plaintiff's motion to remove incorrectly filed documents; the Clerk of Court is directed to re-file documents 148 - 150 under SEAL. (Reader, L)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/08/17 ORDERING that the following dates are reset: Expert Disclosures deadline: 02/01/18; Expert Rebuttal Reports due: 03/05/18; Close of Expert Discovery: 04/16/18; Last day to file dispositive motions is 05/07/18; Last day to file replies to oppositions is 06/25/18; Last day to hear dispositive motions is 07/02/18. (Benson, A.)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING 138 Motion for Order Confirming Settlement signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/18/17. (Kaminski, H)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/21/2017 APPOINTING Melissa Guidera as guardian ad litem for T.G., Danyelle Ellis as guardian ad litem for A.E., and Ayrella Osby as guardian ad litem for B.E. (Michel, G.)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 07/06/17 ORDERING that defendants' 125 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order is GRANTED as follows: all discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, shall be completed by 09/08/17; all counsel are to designate in writing, file with the Court, and serve upon all other parties the name, address, and area of expertise of each expert that they propose to tender at trial by 11/30/17. All other dates in the PTSO remain unchanged. (Benson, A)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 5/31/17, ORDERING that Defendants produce the following within 15 days of this Order: 1. The documents produced in response to the requests for production in the OAH proceeding; 2. The r edacted investigation report produced to Sherry McDaniel's attorney in the OAH proceeding; 3. The transcripts of interviews and audios of the interviews obtained during the investigation. Said documents and data will be subject to the protective order in place in this matter. (Kastilahn, A)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 04/24/17 ORDERING that the 110 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order is GRANTED IN PART as follows: All discovery shall be completed by 08/31/17; Expert Disclosures due 10/31/7 and the las t day to hear dispositive motions is 02/28/18. The parties are also ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than 30 days after receiving this Court's ruling(s) on the last filed dispositive motion. If the parties do not inte nd to file dispositive motions, the parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than 30 days after the close of discovery and the notice must include statements of intent to forgo the filing of dispositive motions. After review of the parties Joint Notice of Trial Readiness, the Court will issue an order that sets forth a final pretrial conference and trial date. (Benson, A)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/13/17 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' MOTION for leave 80 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are directed to file their Proposed First Amended Complaint for Damages not later than thirty (30) calendar days from the date this order is electronically filed. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/5/17: Fact discovery cutoff is continued to June 30, 2017. Expert disclosure deadline is continued to September 30, 2017. The last day to file dispositive motions is continued to December 29, 2017. The deadline to file dispositive motions is continued to The Settlement Conference date remains unchanged. (Kaminski, H)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/26/2016 ORDERING that the parties' request to enforce the 2/16/2016 subpoena served on Heather Hurrt, MFT, 2330 Professional Drive, Suite 100G, Roseville, CA 95678 is GRANTED. Defendant McDaniel is hereby authorized to obtain, by subpoena, the treatment records of minor plaintiff N.P. (Zignago, K.)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR THE IDENTIFICATION AND PRESERVATION OF THE CONFIDENTIALITY OF DOCUMENTS signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 03/29/16. (Benson, A)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/29/2016 ORDERING that the Settlement Conference is CONTINUED to 8/11/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Reader, L)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/21/16 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTION to Compel 56 is GRANTED; The City of Rocklin shall produce responsive documents to defendants within fourteen days of the date of this order; and The responsive documents shall be produced subject to a stipulated protective order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/22/16 ORDERING that the hearing on defendants' 56 Motion to Compel is CONTINUED to 3/9/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire; by 03/02/16, the p arties shall file a joint statement re discovery disagreement that complies with the undersigned's standing order and the Local Rules of this court; and by 03/02/16 the parties shall show cause, in writing, as to why sanctions should not be imposed for their failure to comply with the Local Rules and the order of this court. (Benson, A)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/2/16 ORDERING the Court grants the motion to approve the settlement on behalf of the minors as set forth in the motion; the 10/8/15 Joint Rule 68 Offer of Judgment is approved and the Cl erk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiffs X.C., Nicole Hill and Keith Caldwell; the special needs trust for X.J.C. as presented to this Court is hereby approved, and Nicole Elysecia Hill and Keith J. Caldwell as Guardians ad Lite m are directed to execute said special needs trust for the minor's benefit. The sum of $1,013,916.85 shall be deposited therein. The Trustee of the special needs trust shall be WestAmerica Bank; Venue for on-going oversight of the specia l needs trust established by the order herein shall lie with the Placer County Superior Court, and the Trustee for the special needs trust shall file an account and report with that Court in the manner and frequency called for by the California Proba te Code; Attorneys' fees in the amount of $3,500 shall be paid from the special needs trust to the Dale Law Firm for preparation of the special needs trust for the minor plaintiff; Defendants shall prepare a draft in the amount of $1,013,916.85 payable to WestAmerica Bank as trustee of the special needs trust; Defendants shall prepare a draft in the amount of $346,083.15 to the Hinton, Alfert and Kahn Trust Account. (Becknal, R)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/22/2015 APPROVING the Joint Rule 68 Offer of Judgment; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiffs P.R., Richard Rogers and Terrill Rogers pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 68; APPROVING the distribution of proceeds from the Offer of Judgment and the special needs trust submitted with the moving papers; ORDERING that the venue for the on-going oversight of said special needs trust lie with the Placer County Superior Co urt and that the trustees of the special needs trust file an account and report with the Court in the manner and frequency called for by the California Probate Code; ORDERING that the sum of $502,419.93 (five hundred two thousand, four hundred n ineteen dollars and ninety-three cents) be paid directly to the special needs trust of P.R. and held in a blocked account which may only be made available to the trustees upon further order of the Placer County Superior Court; ORDERING that $50, 000.00 of those funds be held in an account that is accessible to the trustees of the trust; ORDERING the trustees of the special needs trust for P.R. to post bond in the amount of $50,000.00; ORDERING that $3,500.00 (three thousand five hundred dollars and zero cents) be paid from the special needs trust to the Dale Law Firm for the preparation of the special needs trust for P.R. (Michel, G.)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER CONFIRMING THE SETTLEMENT signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/8/15. (Kaminski, H)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 08/11/15. ORDERING that the 15 Motion to Appoint Todd Vrooman as Guardian ad Litem for plaintiff S.V. is GRANTED. (Benson, A)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/10/2015 GRANTING plaintiff's 20 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Plaintiff Michelle Mancour is APPOINTED as Guardian Ad Litem for plaintiff G.I.. (Marciel, M)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/6/15 ORDERING based on the foregoing, the motion to appoint Jennifer Hugunin as guardian ad litem for D.H., Keith Caldwell and Nicole Hill as guardians ad litem for X.C., and Trishia Pitts as guardian ad litem for N.P. (ECF No. 18 ) is GRANTED. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hugunin et al v. Rocklin Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hugunin
Represented By: Todd Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Hugunin
Represented By: Todd Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. H.
Represented By: Todd Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Caldwell
Represented By: Todd Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Hill
Represented By: Todd Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: X. C.
Represented By: Todd Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trishia Pitts
Represented By: Todd Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Pitts
Represented By: Todd Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. P.
Represented By: Todd Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Vrooman
Represented By: Allison Sue Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Vrooman
Represented By: Allison Sue Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. V.
Represented By: Allison Sue Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rogers
Represented By: Allison Sue Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrill Rogers
Represented By: Allison Sue Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. R.
Represented By: Allison Sue Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Mancour
Represented By: Allison Sue Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. I.
Represented By: Allison Sue Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocklin Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Thibideau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Jo Wessinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janna Cambra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Todd Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?