Hicks v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: William Leroy Hicks
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv00978
Filed: May 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/18/17: Plaintiff shall be awarded attorney fees in the amount of $5,000.00, as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d), subject to the terms of this Stipulation.(Kaminski, H)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/26/2016 GRANTING Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING Commissioner's 27 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. This matter is REMANDED to the ALJ for further proceedings consistent with this order. CASE CLOSED. (Jackson, T)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/21/2016 DISCHARGING 25 Order to Show Cause. (Jackson, T)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/22/2016 ORDERING the Commissioner of Social Security to show cause, within 14 days, why monetary sancions should not be imposed for her failure to file a Motion for Summary Judgment. (Michel, G.)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/17/2016 ORDERING that Defendant shall have a third extension of time of 21 days to file her motion for summary judgment; the new due date for Defendant's motion for summary judgment will be Thursday, 6/2/2016. (Reader, L)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/2/16: The new due date for Defendant's motion for summary judgment is Thursday, May 12, 2016. (Kaminski, H)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER 19 for extension of time signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/30/2016. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is NOW DUE on 4/27/2016. (Marciel, M)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/20/2015 ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Motion for Summary Judgment by 12/11/2015. (Michel, G.)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/30/15 ORDERING that the parties' stipulation for the extension of time, ECF No. 14 is GRANTED. (Becknal, R)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/11/15 ORDERING that the 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Clerk to serve scheduling order; within 14 days, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and submit a statement to the court regarding the submission; USM shall serve process within 60 days. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Leroy Hicks
Represented By: Bess M. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Chen
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?