Unico Mechanical Corp. et al v. Harris et al

Plaintiff: Unico Mechanical Corp. and Alfred Conhagen, Inc. of California
Defendant: Kamala Harris, Christine Baker, Diane Ravnik and Matt Rodriguez
Case Number: 2:2015cv00996
Filed: May 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 JUDGMENT signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/19/16 ORDERING that, pursuant to 68 Order entered 12/12/16, Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants Kamala Harris, Christine Baker, Diane Ravnik, and Matt Rodriquez (in their respective official capacities) and of Intervenor-DefendantState Building Construction Trades Council of California, AFL-CIO on all causes of action. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/9/2016 ORDERING that Unico's and Conhagen's motion for summary judgment is DENIED, that the State Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED, and that SBCTC's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED, for the reasons stated by the Court at the 11/15/2016 hearing. (Reader, L)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/8/16 ORDERING the Briefing Schedule for 49 Motion for Summary Judgment as follows: Defendants' oppositions due by 10/11/2016; Plaintiffs' replies due by 11/1/2016; and Defendants' replies in support of any cross-motion due by 11/8/16.(Washington, S)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/11/2016 ORDERING The 4/27/2016 request to seal 37 is DENIED; the Clerk of the Court is direct to file the documents sought to be filed under seal on the public case docket on 5/16/2016; the parti es have until 4:00 PM on 5/13/2016, to file a motion for reconsideration before the assigned District Judge, which will stay the filing of the documents on the public case docket; Defendants' 2/26/2016 motion to compel 31 is GRANTED; and Plaintiffs shall produce the responsive documents within 14 days of the date of this order.(Reader, L)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/4/16 ORDERING that the 4/6/16 hearing on Defendants' MOTION to COMPEL 31 is CONTINUED to 5/11/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The parties shall further meet and confer; On or before 4/27/16, defendants shall file a renewed request to seal that addresses the stanbdards noted above; and On or before 5/4/16, the parties shall file a joint statement re discovery disagreement that complies with the undersigneds standing order and the Local Rules of this Court. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 21 Motion for Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/2/15. (Kastilahn, A)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JOINT STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/26/15. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unico Mechanical Corp. et al v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Represented By: John William Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Baker
Represented By: John William Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Ravnik
Represented By: John William Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Rodriguez
Represented By: John William Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unico Mechanical Corp.
Represented By: Ellen M. Bronchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Conhagen, Inc. of California
Represented By: Ellen M. Bronchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?