Steffen v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Plaintiff: Katie M. Steffen
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company and Brian L. Kline
Case Number: 2:2015cv01025
Filed: May 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yolo
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/26/2017 ORDERING that this case is REMANDED to Yolo County Superior Court. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/7/17: Plaintiff is granted leave to file the Second Amended Complaint, which is to be filed with the Court within ten (10) days of this signed Order. (Kaminski, H)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/8/17 ORDERING that Defendant TIM PAXIN's PACIFIC EXCAVATION, INC. erroneously sued as PACIFIC EXCAVATION, INC.'s deadline to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is 2/27/2017. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/5/17: Plaintiff is granted leave to file the First Amended Complaint, which is to be filed within fourteen (14) days of this Order. (Kaminski, H)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/23/16 ORDERING the date for completion of discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, is reset to 9/30/16. The expert disclosure deadline is reset to 11/28/16. The exchange of lists of rebuttal expert witnesses is currently set for 20 days after 8/26/16 or 9/14/16. The parties request an extension of this deadline to 20 days following the proposed new deadline of 11/28/16 for expert disclosure - or 12/15/16. Coun sel was instructed to complete all discovery of expert witnesses in a timely manner in order to comply with the Court's deadline for filing dispositive motions. As a dispositive motion is not appropriate in this case, the parties request an extension of the expert witness discovery completion date for 75 days after the rebuttal disclosure or 2/28/17. All other dates will remain the same as provided for in the 7/22/15 Pretrial Scheduling Order.(Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steffen v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie M. Steffen
Represented By: Robert Buccola
Represented By: Hank G. Greenblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: John Daniel Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian L. Kline
Represented By: John Daniel Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?