Ramirez-Salgado v. Mule Creek State Prison Warden et al
Petitioner: Jose Ramirez-Salgado
Respondent: Mule Creek State Prison Warden and Board of Prison Members
Case Number: 2:2015cv01037
Filed: May 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/31/2015 DENYING petitioner's 11 request for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/13/2015 GRANTING petitioner's 2 motion to proceed IFP; AND RECOMMENDING that petitioner's 1 application for writ of habeas corpus be summarily dismissed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/5/2015 DENYING without prejudice petitioner's 6 request for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez-Salgado v. Mule Creek State Prison Warden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Ramirez-Salgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mule Creek State Prison Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Board of Prison Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?