Williams v. California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation et al
Plaintiff: John W. Williams
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, Arnold Schwarzenegger, James E. Tilton, Jeanne S. Woodford, John Dovey, Peter Farber Szekrenyi and Anthony Malfi
Case Number: 2:2015cv01057
Filed: May 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/24/2016 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/7/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's requests for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and for the United States Marshal to effect service of process (ECF Nos. 20, 22) are denied. Plaintiff is again cautioned that failure to timely accomplish service will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed.(Dillon, M)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/7/15 ORDERING that plaintiff shall show cause within 21 days from the date of this order as to why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice.(Dillon, M)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/3/15 ORDERING that plaintiff's request for assistance from the United States Marshal (ECF No. 11 ) is denied.(Dillon, M)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/8/15 ORDERING that Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A, the complaint states potentially cognizable claims against all defendants under Title II of the Americans with Disabilities Act and section 504 of the Rehabilitation Act. The Clerk of the Court shall issue a summons and new case civil documents.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne S. Woodford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Dovey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Farber Szekrenyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Malfi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?