(PC) Solano v. Perez, et al
Plaintiff: Librado Solano, Jr.
Defendant: Alexader, Perez, Yin Allan J., George, Afshin Eslami, Peterson, Harold Tate and Baltran
Case Number: 2:2015cv01064
Filed: April 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 JUDGMENT dated *2/21/2018* pursuant to order, signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/21/2018. (Reader, L)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/21/2018 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS #69 are ADOPTED in FULL; and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
February 21, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #71 Judgment, #70 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, served on Librado Solano Jr. (Reader, L)
December 8, 2017 Filing 69 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/7/2017 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
December 8, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #69 Findings and Recommendations served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Yin, K)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/7/2017 DENYING #65 Motion for Reconsideration. (Zignago, K.)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/07/17 ORDERING within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file either an opposition to the motion or a statement of no opposition. (Plummer, M)
November 7, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #67 Order served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Plummer, M)
November 7, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #68 Order served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Zignago, K.)
October 25, 2017 Filing 66 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Afshin Eslami to #65 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #64 Order. (Poppinga, Theodore)
October 4, 2017 Filing 65 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #64 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by George, Perez, Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities)(Lodholz, Sean)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/29/2017 REJECTING #43 Findings and Recommendations; DENYING #36 Motion for Summary Judgment; REFERRING this matter back to Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for further proceedings. (Michel, G.)
September 29, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #64 Order Rejecting Findings and Recommendations served on Librado Solano, Jr. (Michel, G.)
September 26, 2017 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, inactive: #59 Order sent to Librado Solano, Jr. (Becknal, R)
September 20, 2017 Filing 63 LETTER from Attorney Theodore D. Poppinga re reserving Plaintiff Librado Solano, Jr., with #57 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kastilahn, A)
September 19, 2017 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Afshin Eslami re #57 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Poppinga, Theodore)
September 19, 2017 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #59 Order re-served on Librado Solano Jr. to updated address (ECF No. 60). (Henshaw, R)
September 18, 2017 Filing 61 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 418 Brian St, Santa Maria, CA 93454 by Librado Solano, Jr. (Kastilahn, A)
September 18, 2017 Filing 60 ADDRESS UPDATED to 418 Brian Street, Santa Maria, CA 93454; Pursuant to Change of Address Filed in Case Number 1:15-cv-756 DAD-SAB. (Flores, E)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/12/17 DENYING #54 Motion to Compel. (Plummer, M)
September 12, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #59 Order on Motion to Compel served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Plummer, M)
September 1, 2017 Filing 58 DECLARATION of T. Poppinga in Support of #57 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Afshin Eslami. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Poppinga, Theodore) Modified on 9/5/2017 (Yin, K).
September 1, 2017 Filing 57 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Afshin Eslami. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Statement Separate, #3 Declaration of Eric T. London, M.D., #4 Declaration of Dr. Afshin Eslami, #5 Notice Rand, #6 Proof of Service)(Poppinga, Theodore)
June 20, 2017 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Theodore D. Popppinga in OPPOSITION TO #54 Motion to Compel Discovery. (Poppinga, Theodore)
June 20, 2017 Filing 55 OPPOSITION by Afshin Eslami to #54 Motion to Compel Discovery. (Poppinga, Theodore)
June 5, 2017 Filing 54 MOTION to COMPEL Discovery by Librado Solano, Jr. (Hunt, G)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/20/2017 DISREGARDING #52 Request for production of documents filed by Librado Solano, Jr.. (Henshaw, R)
April 20, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #53 Order served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Henshaw, R)
April 6, 2017 Filing 52 [DISREGARDED pursuant to #53 Order] REQUEST for production of documents by Librado Solano, Jr. (Kaminski, H) Modified on 4/20/2017 (Donati, J).
April 4, 2017 Filing 51 RESPONSE by George, Perez, Peterson to #50 Objections to Findings and Recommendations. (Lodholz, Sean)
March 27, 2017 Filing 50 OBJECTIONS to #43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Librado Solano, Jr. (Benson, A)
March 13, 2017 Filing 49 STATEMENT of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. 46] by Defendants George, Perez, Peterson. (Lodholz, Sean)
March 10, 2017 Filing 48 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Afshin Eslami to #46 MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME. Attorney Poppinga, Theodore Derk added. (Poppinga, Theodore) Modified on 3/13/2017 (Plummer, M).
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/28/2017 GRANTING plaintiff's #46 request and plaintiff has 30 days to file his objections to the findings and recommendations. (Yin, K)
February 28, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #47 Order on Motion for Extension served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Yin, K)
February 23, 2017 Filing 46 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to file objections to F & R's by Librado Solano, Jr. (Reader, L)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY and SCHEDULING ORDER (applies only to plaintiff and defendant Eslami) signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/21/2017: Discovery due by 6/30/2017; Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before 9/29/2017; the court will schedule pretrial proceedings, if necessary, upon resolution of any pretrial motions filed. (Yin, K)
February 22, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #45 Supplemental Discovery and Scheduling Order served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Yin, K)
February 14, 2017 Filing 44 ANSWER TO PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Afshin Eslami. Attorney Zimmerman, Robert Harry added. (Zimmerman, Robert)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/06/17 ORDERING the Clerk of Court randomly assign a United State District Judge to this action. U.S. District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' Perez, George, and Peterson's motion for summary judgment #36 be granted and that this action proceed solely against defendant Afshin Eslami. Motion for Summary Judgment #36 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
February 7, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #43 Order,,, Findings and Recommendations (Motion),, served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Plummer, M)
September 26, 2016 Filing 42 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Christopher James Becker for George, Perez and Peterson, attorney Gabriel Ullrich terminated (Becker, Christopher) Modified on 9/27/2016 (Plummer, M).
August 25, 2016 Filing 41 REPLY by George, Perez, Peterson re #39 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Opposition to MSJ)(Lodholz, Sean)
August 25, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sean W. Lodholz on behalf of George, Perez, Peterson. Attorney Lodholz, Sean W. added. (Lodholz, Sean)
August 18, 2016 Filing 39 OPPOSITION by Librado Solano, Jr to #36 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Butolph, J)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/26/16 GRANTING #37 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to file his opposition.(Dillon, M)
July 27, 2016 SERVICE BY MAIL: #38 Order, served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Dillon, M)
July 18, 2016 Filing 37 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to file Opposition to #36 Motion for Summary Judgment by Librado Solano, Jr. (Benson, A)
June 22, 2016 Filing 36 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by George, Perez, Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration of S. Reddy with Exhibits 1-11, #3 Rand Warning)(Ullrich, Gabriel)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/21/16 DENYING #32 Motion to Compel. (Dillon, M)
June 21, 2016 SERVICE BY MAIL: #35 Order, served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Dillon, M)
June 1, 2016 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Gabriel Ullrich re #33 Opposition to Motion. (Ullrich, Gabriel)
May 26, 2016 Filing 33 OPPOSITION by George, Perez, Peterson to #32 MOTION to COMPEL Production of Documents. (Ullrich, Gabriel)
May 5, 2016 Filing 32 MOTION TO COMPEL Production of Documents; REQUEST FOR REIMBURSEMENT of reasonable expenses by Librado Solano, Jr. (Michel, G.)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/16/2016 GRANTING plaintiff's #30 unopposed motion to modify the schedule as follows: Plaintiff may conduct discovery until 5/27/2016; Any motions necessary to compel discovery shall be filed by that date; All requests for discovery pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 31,33,34, or 36 shall be served no later than 3/24/2016. (Yin, K)
February 16, 2016 SERVICE BY MAIL: #31 Order on Motion served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Yin, K)
January 13, 2016 Filing 30 MOTION for a 60-day Extension of Time for New Discovery Deadline Date by Librado Solano, Jr. (Becknal, R)
January 4, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CSP- Sacramento P.O. Box 290066 Represa, CA 95671 by Librado Solano, Jr. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DISCOVERY and SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/3/15: Discovery due by 3/25/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 6/24/2016. (Dillon, M)
December 4, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #28 Discovery and Scheduling Order served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Dillon, M)
October 6, 2015 Filing 27 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Afshin Eslami Waiver sent on 7/14/2015. (Kaminski, H)
September 11, 2015 Filing 26 ANSWER TO PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by George, Perez, Peterson. Attorney Ullrich, Gabriel added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ullrich, Gabriel)
August 17, 2015 Filing 25 WAIVERS of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Perez, George, Peterson Waivers sent on 7/14/2015. (Kaminski, H) Modified on 8/19/2015 (Yin, K).
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT Consent or Decline due by 8/6/2015 signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/02/15. (Plummer, M)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/02/15 DIRECTING USM to serve * amended complaint * filed on * 5/11/15,* on * Afshin Eslami, George, Perez, Peterson*,. (Plummer, M)
July 2, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #23 Order Directing Service by USM and local rules served on Librado Solano Jr. 5 summons, 4 USM-285 forms, 5 copies of the 5/11/15 amended complaint, 5 consent forms and 5 copies of this order to the U.S. Marshal. (Plummer, M)
June 26, 2015 Filing 22 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Librado Solano, Jr. (Benson, A)
June 25, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS: 4 Summons, 4 USM-285 Forms, and 4 copies of the amended complaint, by Librado Solano, Jr. (Benson, A)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/3/15 DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS and USM-285 Forms within 30 days. Service is appropriate for Afshin Eslami, George, Perez, Peterson. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 4 USM-285 Forms, and 1 copy of the Amended Complaint filed on 5/11/15. (Dillon, M)
June 4, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #20 Service Documents Order, four USM-285 forms, one summons, an instruction sheet and one copy of the May 11, 2015 amended complaint served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Dillon, M)
May 28, 2015 Filing 19 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 7/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Marrujo, C)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the Sacramento Division, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/15/15. New case number is: 2:15-cv-01064-EFB; Old case number is: 1:14-cv-00633-BAM. (Marrujo, C)
May 28, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #19 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Marrujo, C)
May 11, 2015 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Librado Solano, Jr. (Gonzalez, R)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's First Motion For Extension Of Time (ECF No. #15 ), 90-Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/1/2015. First Amended Complaint due by 8/7/2015. (Fahrney, E)
May 4, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #16 Order on Motion for Extension, served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Fahrney, E)
April 30, 2015 Filing 15 MOTION For NINETY-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME To File First Amended Complaint (Doc. #14 ), by Librado Solano, Jr. (Fahrney, E)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCREENING ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/07/2015. Amended Complaint due by 5/11/2015. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Flores, E)
April 7, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend served on Librado Solano Jr. (Flores, E)
June 25, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to High Desert State Prison, P.O. Box 3030, Susanville, CA 96127 by Librado Solano, Jr. (Fahrney, E)
June 2, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to P.O. Box 1902, Tehachapi, CA 93581 by Librado Solano, Jr. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 2, 2014 Filing 11 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Librado Solano, Jr. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 7, 2014 Filing 10 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Librado Solano, Jr. (Verduzco, M)
May 7, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Librado Solano, Jr. Address Remains the Same. (Verduzco, M)
April 30, 2014 Filing 8 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/2/2014 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 30, 2014 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 29, 2014 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:14-cv-02723.
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II transferring case to the UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. Case electronically sent to the Eastern District. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (Attachments: #1 CV 22) (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/29/2014.]
April 25, 2014 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick re: Complaint #4 . Proposed Order Transferring Action, etc. forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(ts) [Transferred from cacd on 4/29/2014.]
April 16, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 4/29/2014.]
April 16, 2014 Filing 4 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants Alexader, Baltran, Doe 1, Doe 2, Afshin Eslami, George, Yin Allan J., Perez, Peterson, Harold Tate pursuant to 42: 1983. Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick; (Filing fee IN FORMA PAUPERIS); filed by plaintiff Librado Solano, Jr. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4, #4 part 5)(esa) [Transferred from cacd on 4/29/2014.]
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick granting #1 #2 Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Full Filing Fee. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 4/29/2014.]
April 9, 2014 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner, filed by plaintiff Librado Solano, Jr. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 4/29/2014.]
April 9, 2014 Filing 1 REQUEST to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Librado Solano, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Complaint)(ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 4/29/2014.]
April 9, 2014 LODGED COMPLAINT forwarded to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Complaint sought to be filed by Plaintiff Librado Solano, Jr. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 4/29/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Solano v. Perez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perez
Represented By: Christopher James Becker
Represented By: Sean W. Lodholz
Represented By: Gabriel Rogers Ullrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yin Allan J.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George
Represented By: Christopher James Becker
Represented By: Sean W. Lodholz
Represented By: Gabriel Rogers Ullrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Afshin Eslami
Represented By: Robert Harry Zimmerman
Represented By: Theodore Derk Poppinga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterson
Represented By: Christopher James Becker
Represented By: Sean W. Lodholz
Represented By: Gabriel Rogers Ullrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Librado Solano, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?