Rosales, et al. v. Dutschke, et al.
Plaintiff: Walter J. Rosales, Karen Toggery, April Louise Palmer, Elisa Welmas, Estate of Helen Cuerro, Estate of Dean Rosales, Estate of Walter Rosales' Unnamed Brother, Estate of Marie Toggery and Estate of Matthew Toggery
Defendant: Amy Dutschke, John Rydzik, Kenneth Meza, Carlene A. Chamberlain, Robert W. Mesa, Richard J. Tellow, Erica M. Pinto, Penn National Gaming Inc., San Diego Gaming Ventures, LLC and C.W. Driver
Case Number: 2:2015cv01145
Filed: May 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 25:640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/27/2020 ORDERING cases 2:15-cv-01145-KJM-KJN and 2:20-cv-00521-JAM-CKD are RELATED. Case 2:20-cv-00521-JAM-CKD is REASSIGNED to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings. (Zignago, K.)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/29/2017 ORDERING 62 Defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED WITHOUT LEAVE to Amend. Plaintiffs' motion to substitute is DENIED as MOOT. The parties' stipulation to continue hearing on plaintiffs' motion for substitution, ECF No. 96 , is DENIED as MOOT as well. This order resolves ECF Nos. 62 -1 and 63 -1, 92 and 96 . This case is CLOSED (Reader, L)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/2/16: Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 52) shall be filed and all defendants shall respond to that Complaint on or before July 1, 2016. (Kaminski, H)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/2/2016 GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART 27 , 33 Motions to Dismiss; DISMISSING the 1 Complaint for failure to comply with F.R.Cv.P. Rule 8(a); GRANTING the plaintiffs twenty-one days to fi le an amended complaint; ORDERING that service on Kenny Meza, Richard Mesa, Richard Tellow, Amy Dutschke and John Rydzik, in their personal capacities, be completed within seven days of the date any amended complaint is filed, if those persons are named as defendants. (Michel, G.)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/4/2015 DISCHARGING the 14 Order to Show Cause; GRANTING the plaintiff's request for extension to serve process pursuant to Rule 4(m); FINDING that the time for service of the complaint is retroactively extended by 30 days to 10/26/2015. (Michel, G.)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/3/15: The court VACATES the order of September 28, 2015 8 . Plaintiffs are ordered to show cause within 10 days of the date of this order why the claims against Mr. Meza, Mr. Mesa, Mr. Tellow, and the federal defendants, Ms. Dutschke and Mr. Rydzik, should not be dismissed under Rule 4(m). Defendants Penn National Gaming and C.W. Driver are ordered to respond to the complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. (Kaminski, H)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/28/15 ORDERING that Defendants have until thirty days after the last named defendant has been served to file a response to the Complaint.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosales, et al. v. Dutschke, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter J. Rosales
Represented By: Patrick Dennis Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Toggery
Represented By: Patrick Dennis Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Louise Palmer
Represented By: Patrick Dennis Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisa Welmas
Represented By: Patrick Dennis Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Helen Cuerro
Represented By: Patrick Dennis Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Dean Rosales
Represented By: Patrick Dennis Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Walter Rosales' Unnamed Brother
Represented By: Patrick Dennis Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Marie Toggery
Represented By: Patrick Dennis Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Matthew Toggery
Represented By: Patrick Dennis Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Dutschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Rydzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Meza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlene A. Chamberlain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Mesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Tellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica M. Pinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penn National Gaming Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Gaming Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.W. Driver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?