USA v. Estate of Joseph Arleo
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Estate of Joseph Arleo and Anthony Pesola
Case Number: 2:2015cv01239
Filed: June 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yolo
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER OF JUDGMENT signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/7/2018 ORDERING defendants are liable to United States for unpaid civil penalty assessments due to the failure of Joseph Arleo to file a Form TD F90-22.1 for the year 2006. Judgment is h ereby entered against defendants, the Estate of Joseph Arleo and Anthony Pesola as the administrator of the Estate of Joseph Arleo and in favor of Plaintiff, the United States of America, in the amount of $1,200,000.00. Each party shall bear their own expenses and costs. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/17/2018 CONTINUING Trial to 8/20/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Zignago, K.)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/18/18 DENYING without prejudice 52 Motion to Compel as untimely. (Benson, A.)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/19/17 ORDERING that, pursuant to 33 Stipulation, the Scheduling Order is MODIFIED as follows: all Discovery due by 1/12/2018; Dispositive Motions filed by 3/12/2018 and heard 04/10/18; Joint Pret rial Statement due: 06/01/18; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez; Jury Trial set for 7/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Benson, A.)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/7/2017 ORDERING that fact discovery and discovery be completed by 10/20/2017; ORDERING that dispositive motions be filed by 12/19/2017 and that such motions be noticed for hearing on 1/16/2018; ORDERING the parties to file a Joint Pretrial Statement by 2/23/2018; CONTINUING the Final Pretrial Conference to 3/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez; CONTINUING the Jury Trial to 4/9/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Michel, G.)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/17/17 ORDERING that the deadlines in the Scheduling Order previously set forth by the Court are revised as follows: fact discovery cut-off is 9/15/2017, discovery cut-off is 9/15/2017, dispositive motions cut-off is 11/7/2017, dispositive motion hearing is 12/5/2017 at 1:30 p.m.. Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 2/2/2018 at 10:00 AM, and the Trial is SET for 3/12/2018 at 09:00 AM, BOTH in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/19/2017 ORDERING that the deadlines in the Scheduling Order are REVISED as follows: Fact Discovery cut-off: 7/14/2017; Discovery cut-off: 7/14/2017; Dispositive Motions cut-off: 9/5/2017; Dispositive Motion Hearing: 10/3/2017; Final Pre-Trial Conference: 11/3/2017 at 11:00 AM; Trial: 12/11/2017 at 9:00 AM. (Zignago, K.)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/17/17 ORDERING that Fact Discovery due by 5/19/2017; Discovery cut-off 5/19/2017. Dispositive Motions cut-off 7/11/2017. Dispositive Motion Hearing 8/8/17 at 1:30 p.m. Final Pretrial Conference SET for 9/8/2017 at 10:00 AM. Trial SET for 10/16/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER (AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT) signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/10/2017 ORDERING the deadlines in the Scheduling Order are REVISED as follows: Fact Discovery cut-off is RESET to April 28, 2017; Discovery cut-off is RESET to April 28, 2017; Dispositive Motions cut-off is RESET to June 6, 2017; Dispositive Motion Hearing is RESET to July 11, 2017; Final Pre-Trial Conference is RESET to Aug. 18, 2017 @ 11 a.m; Trial is RESET to Sept. 25, 2017 @ 9 a.m. (Becknal, R)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/24/16 ORDERING scheduling order MODIFIED as follows: Fact Discovery Cut-Off now due by 3/16/2017; Discovery now due by 3/31/2017; Dispositive Motions now due by 5/9/2017; Dispositive Motion Hearing to be heard on 6/6/17 at 1:30 PM; Final Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 7/14/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez; and Bench Trial CONTINUED to 8/21/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez.(Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Estate of Joseph Arleo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Joseph Arleo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Pesola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Paul Timothy Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?