Freeman et al v. Wilshire Commercial Capital L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Verina Freeman and Valecea Diggs
Defendant: Wilshire Commercial Capital L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01428
Filed: July 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/14/2019 ORDERING that the above-entitled action is DISMISSED, with prejudice. CASE CLOSED(Washington, S)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/5/18 ORDERING that Status Conference re Stay shall be continued to 1/28/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. If the dismissal is not yet filed, the parties shall file a Joint Status Statement not later than 1/14/2019. (Kaminski, H)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing Stay 109 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/25/2018: The Status Conference is reset for 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The parties shall file a joint status conference statement no later than 12/3/2018. (Kirksey Smith, K)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/30/2018 ORDERING the Status Conference CONTINUED to 11/5/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Washington, S)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/6/18, ORDERING that the court will stay class discovery until the Supreme Court issues an opinion. A Status Conference is SET for 8/6/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kastilahn, A)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/28/18. (Kaminski, H)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Dates 68 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/22/2017: 1) Discovery concerning the alleged capacity of defendant's Automatic Telephone Dialing System to make autodialed calls to Plaintiffs shall be con tinued to 1/19/2017; 2) Defendants shall produce their designated rebuttal expert for a deposition during the first three weeks of December 2017; 3) A hearing for motion regarding the alleged capacity of Defendant's Automatic Telephone Dialing S ystem to make autodialed calls to Plaintiffs is set for 2/26/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Any motion regarding the alleged capacity of defendant's Automatic Telephone Dialing System to make autodial ed calls to Plaintiffs shall be filed by 1/17/2018, Opposition thereto shall be filed by 2/2/2018, and Reply to such Opposition shall be filed by 2/12/2018; 4) A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/26/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb to reset dates; 5) A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 2/12/2018; 6)The Pretrial Conference date of 1/29/2018 and Trial date of 3/27/2018 are VACATED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/18/17ORDERING the Discovery concerning the alleged capacity of defendant's Automatic Telephone Dialing System to make autodialed calls to Plaintiffs shall be continued to November 13, 2017; P laintiffs are ordered to produce their designated expert for deposition on October 12, 2017 in San Diego; With re to expert testimony intended solely for rebuttal, those experts shall be disclosed and reports produced in accordance with Federal Ru le of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) on or before October 25, 2017; A hearing for motion regarding the alleged capacity of Defendant's Automatic Telephone Dialing System to make autodialed calls to Plaintiffs shall take place on January 16, 2018 at 1 :30 p.m. Any motion re the alleged capacity of defendant's Automatic Telephone Dialing System to make autodialed calls to Plaintiffs shall be filed by November 30, 2017, Opposition thereto shall be filed by December 18, 2017, and Reply to such O pposition shall be filed by January 4, 2018; Following the hearing on the motion re the capacity of Defendant's alleged Automatic Telephone Dialing System on January 16 2018 at 1:30 p.m., the Court will conduct a case management conference to reset the current Pretrial Conference date of January 29, 2018 and trial date of March 27, 2018. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than January 2, 2018. (Becknal, R)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/27/17. The parties shall disclose Experts and produce reports by no lather than 8/21/2017. Discovery concerning the alleged capacity of defendant's Automatic Telephone Dialing System to make autodialed calls to Plaintiffs shall be continued to 9/18/2017. With regard to expert testimony intended solely for rebuttal, those experts shall be disclosed and reports produced on or before 9/21/17. A hearing for MOTION regarding the alleged capacity of Defendant's Automatic Telephone Dialing System to make autodialed calls to Plaintiffs shall take place on 11/13/17 at 1:30 p.m. Any motion regarding the alleged capacity of defendant's Automatic Telephone Dialing System to make autodialed calls to Plaintiffs shall be filed by 10/6/17, Opposition thereto shall be filed by 10/20/17, and Reply to such Opposition shall be filed by 10/30/17 2017. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/21/2017 ORDERING that discovery concerning the alleged capacity of defendant's Automatic Telephone Dialing System to make autodialed calls to Plaintiffs is CONTINUED to 7/26/20 17. Designation of Expert Witnesses due 5/30/2017. With regard to expert testimony intended solely for rebuttal, those experts shall be disclosed on or before 6/30/2017. A hearing for motion regarding the alleged capacity of Defendant's Automat ic Telephone Dialing System to make autodialed calls to Plaintiffs shall take place on 8/21/2017 at 1:30 p.m. Any motion regarding the alleged capacity of defendant's Automatic Telephone Dialing System to make autodialed calls to Plaintiffs sh all be filed by 7/24/2017, Opposition thereto shall be filed by 8/7/2017, and Reply to such Opposition shall be filed by 8/14/2017. Discovery concerning class certification shall commence on 8/29/2017. Any hearing for a motion for class certificat ion shall take place on 11/13/2017 at 1:30 p.m. Any motion for class certification shall be filed by 10/2/2017, Opposition thereto shall be filed by 10/23/2017, Reply to such Opposition shall be filed by 10/30/2017. All other dates shall remain on calendar. (Zignago, K.)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/22/2017 DENYING 42 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/9/2017 MODIFYING the 38 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order; ORDERING that discovery concerning the alleged capacity of Defendants Automatic Telephone Dialing System to make autodia led calls to Plaintiffs be completed by 5/22/2017; ORDERING the parties to disclose experts and produce reports by 4/24/2017 and to disclose rebuttal experts and produce reports by 5/22/2017; ORDERING that the motion regarding the alleged capacity of Defendants Automatic Telephone Dialing System to make autodialed calls to Plaintiffs be held on 7/10/2017 at 01:30 PM; ORDERING that said motion be filed by 6/5/2017; ORDERING that any opposition to said motion be filed by 6/19/2017 and that any rep ly be filed by 6/26/2017; ORDERING that discovery concerning the merits of the class commence on 7/6/2017; ORDERING that any hearing for a Motion fo Class Certification be held on 9/18/2017 at 01:30 PM; ORDERING that said motion be filed by 8/7/2017; ORDERING that any opposion to said motion be filed by 8/21/2017 and that any reply be filed by 8/28/2017; ORDERING that all other dates remain on calendar. (Michel, G.)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/22/16 ORDERING that the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference scheduled for 9/26/2016 is VACATED. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by 10/11/2016. Discovery s hall be completed by 9/11/2017. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 1/3/2017, and supplemental expert disclosures due on or before 2/3/2017. Final Pretrial Conference SET for 1/29/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Jury Trial SET for 3/27/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (See order for further details on various due dates/motion filings.) (Kastilahn, A)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/16/16 ORDERING that The Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference herein is RESET for 9/26/16 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 5; and the parties shall meet and confer and submit a Joint Status Report in accordance with Local Rule 240 by no later than 9/12/16. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/13/16 ORDERING the Status Conference set for July 18, 2016 is hereby continued to August 15, 2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom No. 5, pending the Western District of Pennsylvania's ruling on t he final approval of the class action settlement in Duchene v. Westlake Services, LLC, Civ. No. 2:13-1577 MRH (W.D. Pa.); the parties shall meet and confer prior to the August 15, 2016 Status Conference; and the parties shall submit an updated Joint Status Report by no later than August 8, 2016 addressing the issues outlined in this Order and any other issues that they think need to be addressed at the August 15, 2016 Status Conference. (Becknal, R)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/12/2016: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) the stay ordered in the court's 19 Order of 10/30/2015 is hereby LIFTED; (2) a Scheduling Conference is set for 7/18/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The parties shall meet and confer prior to that date; and (3) the parties shall file an updated Joint Status Report containing the information set forth in this court's initial 4 Order of 7/6/2015 on or before 7/5/2016. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/30/15 ORDERING that (1) proceedings in this action shall be, and the same hereby are, STAYED until February 22, 2016 pending the resolution of Defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of sta nding in Banarji v. Wilshire Commercial Capital, LLC dba Wilshire Consumer Credit, Civ. No. 3:14-2967 BEN KSC (S.D. Cal.); (2) this case is set for a Status Conference on February 22, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 5; and (3) the parties shall file a Joint Status Report with this court no later than February 8, 2016 setting forth the status of discovery in this case and the progress of the Banarji action in the Southern District of California. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman et al v. Wilshire Commercial Capital L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verina Freeman
Represented By: Elliot Jason Conn
Represented By: Bryan Kemnitzer
Represented By: Scott D. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valecea Diggs
Represented By: Elliot Jason Conn
Represented By: Bryan Kemnitzer
Represented By: Scott D. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilshire Commercial Capital L.L.C.
Represented By: Michelle Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?