Wilson v. Beard et al
Plaintiff: Jasper F. Wilson
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Beard, R. L. Briggs, M. Hodges and K. J. Allen
Case Number: 2:2015cv01481
Filed: July 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/03/20 DISMISSING CASE pursuant to stipulation of dismissal 68 and FRCP 41(a). CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/13/19 DENYING 57 Motion to Appoint Temporary Counsel and GRANTING 58 Motion for Extension for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs opposition to the sanctions motion, 59 , is now due January 8, 2020. In light of the generous amount of time provided, no additional extensions of time will be granted absent exigent circumstances. (Plummer, M)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/25/19 DENYING 49 plaintiff's discovery motion. (Plummer, M)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/20/19 ORDERING that within 21 days of the date of this order, defendants shall file an opposition, if any, to plaintiffs motion to compel.(Plummer, M)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/2/2019 ADIOPTING the 41 findings and recommendations in full. Defendants' 20 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/23/18 RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion to dismiss 20 be denied without prejudice to the assertion of any defenses on a motion for summary judgment. Motion to Dismiss 20 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/20 DENYING 20 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of the Court copy and attach the exhibits from plaintiffs 1 original complaint to plaintiffs 12 first amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/9/2018 DENYING 31 Motion to Declare Defendants Legally Incompetent and DENYING as moot 34 Motion for Sanctions. (Henshaw, R)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/3/2018 GRANTING 26 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff to file and serve his response within 30 days of the date of this order. Defendants' reply, if any, to be filed and served within 7 days thereafter. (Henshaw, R)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/2/2017 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jasper F. Wilson. (cc: CDCR Prisoner Payments, Financial) (Henshaw, R) Modified on 5/2/2017 (Donati, J).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Beard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasper F. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. L. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. J. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?