Gnibus v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lynn Eileen Gnibus
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv01669
Filed: August 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/13/17. (Kaminski, H)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/08/17 ORDERING that, pursuant to 21 Stipulation, that fees and expenses in the amount of $4,085.00 and no costs are awarded. (Benson, A)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/13/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 12 is GRANTED; The Commissioner's Cross MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 17 is DENIED; This matter is REMANDED to the Commissioner for the immediate calculation and payment of benefits to Plaintiff; and the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for Plaintiff, and close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/27/16 ORDERING that Defendant shall have an extension of time to 5/4/2016 to respond to Plaintiff's opening brief. (Kastilahn, A)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/23/16 ORDERING that the date for defendant to respond to plaintiff's opening brief is EXTENDED to 04/20/16. (Benson, A)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/16/2015 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve the scheduling order in social security cases; ORDERING the plaintiff to submit to the United States Marshal within fourteen (14) days, a completed 4 Summons and copies of the 1 Social Security Complaint and to file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted; DIRECTING the U.S. Marshal to serve all process without prepayment of costs within sixty days. (cc: U.S. Marshal) (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gnibus v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Eileen Gnibus
Represented By: Vijay Jagdish Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?