Jackson v. Galang et al

Plaintiff: Curtis Vaughn Jackson, Jr.
Defendant: Carmelino L. Galang, Nikolaj Wolfson, David Smiley, R.N. Menandro, Evalyn Horowitz and Sam Wong-Do
Case Number: 2:2015cv01675
Filed: August 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/27/2019 GRANTING 120 Motion for Extension of Time and 121 , 122 , and 123 Opposition Brief and supporting filings are deemed timely. (Henshaw, R)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 05/23/19 DENYING 114 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 4/22/2019 DENYING plaintiff's 106 motion. (Yin, K)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 3/26/2019 ORDERING Defendant to file a response to 106 Motion for Referral to Settlement Conference within 30 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/27/18 DENYING 88 Motion for Reconsideration as premature. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/30/18 DENYING 83 , 95 plaintiff's motions. (Plummer, M)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 07/26/18 DENYING 84 Motion for copies of the case file. Defendant is directed to file a response to plaintiff's motions for an order setting a settlement conference 83 and 95 within 30 days of the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER adopting in full 59 Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/25/18. The motion to dismiss 33 filed by defendants Galang and Wolfson is GRANTED. The motion to dismiss 40 filed by the remaining defendants is DENIED in PART as to defendant Dator and GRANTED in PART as to all other defendants. This action shall proceed against defendant Dator only, who shall file an answer to the complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/01/18 GRANTING 76 Motion to reinstate this case. The order issued on November 30, 2017 75 is vacated and the Clerk of the Court is directed to reinstate this case. Plaintiff's motions for leave to amend 69 and 76 are DENIED. (Plummer, M) Modified on 3/1/2018 (Plummer, M).
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/30/2017 DISMISSING Case. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/7/2017 DENYING 57 Motion to Open Discovery. (Henshaw, R)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/18/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 48 motion for sanctions and 55 motion for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/5/2016 ORDERING plaintiff's 19 motion for injunctive relief is DENIED; plaintiff's 21 motion to amend is DENIED; the first amended complaint filed 4/8/2016 is STRICKEN and this action shall proceed on the original complaint; and plaintiff's 26 motion for an extension of time is DENIED. (Yin, K)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/23/16 DENYING 4 Motion for injunctive relief. (Dillon, M)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/11/16 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Curtis Vaughn Jackson, Jr. and forward payment to the court until the b alance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/27/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certified copy of his trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Galang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Vaughn Jackson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmelino L. Galang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikolaj Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.N. Menandro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evalyn Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Wong-Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?