Knighten v. City of Anderson et al

Plaintiff: Gerald Knighten
Defendant: City of Anderson, City of Anderson Police Department, Michael Johnson and Sean Miller
Case Number: 2:2015cv01751
Filed: August 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 02/07/18 SETTING a further Settlement Conference for 2/22/2018 at 09:00 AM in Redding (CMK) before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. (Benson, A.)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/11/2017 ORDERING defendants' counsel's request for a 90-day extension of time to inform the court regarding the attorney's fees request. Good cause appearing therefor,the request is GRANTED. Counsel shall inform the court in writing within 90 days of the date of this order whether counsel is still seeking attorney's fees. (Reader, L)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/23/17. Defendants' counsel shall notify the court in writing within ten days of the date of this order whether counsel is still pursuing the attorney's fees request. Failure to comply will be construed as withdrawal of the attorney's fees request. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/12/2016 GRANTING 31 Motion for Sanctions; ORDERING the plaintiff's counsel to file a declaration confirming that all confidential materials produced in the Haught case have been r eturned to the defendants or destroyed; IMPOSING a sanction in the amount of $750.00 on the plaintiff's counsel for violation of the court's protective order, to be paid by counsel to the court within 10 days; PERMITTING Defendants' counsel to submit a declaration supporting an award of attorneys' fees within 10 days. (Michel, G.)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/5/16 ORDERING that a Settlement Conference is scheduled for 8/4/2016 at 09:30 AM in Redding (CMK) before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. The parties are directed to each submit a confidential settlement conference statement directly to chambers by 7 days prior to conference.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/2/2016 ORDERING the City Defendants 22 Motion for Sanctions for violations of court orders; and 23 Motion to Dismiss are hereby WITHDRAWN; the parties are ORDERED to attend a mandatory Settlement Conference with Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison set for 8/4/2016 at 09:30 AM. Should this case not resolve at the mandatory settlement conference, the City Defendants can thereafter re-file both motions. (Reader, L)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/30/2016 ORDERING 8 that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED without prejudice; Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of entry of this order to file an amended complaint that complies with the requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Rules of Practice. (Reader, L)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SEAL signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/26/2015 GRANTING that pages 1 and 3 of the Police Report, attached as Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants City of Anderson's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 11 ) are hereby REDACTED, (and the Unredacted Version is SEALED). (Krueger, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knighten v. City of Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Knighten
Represented By: Cathleen Theresa Barr
Represented By: John Dugan Douglas Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Anderson
Represented By: Carrie Anne Frederickson
Represented By: Bruce Alan Kilday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Anderson Police Department
Represented By: Carrie Anne Frederickson
Represented By: Bruce Alan Kilday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Johnson
Represented By: Carrie Anne Frederickson
Represented By: Bruce Alan Kilday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?