Gonzales v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Matthew Robert Gonzales
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv01771
Filed: August 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/30/2017 AWARDING the plaintiff attorney fees in the amount of $6,100.00 under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d). (Michel, G.)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/21/2017 ORDERING that plaintiff's 16 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Defendant's 18 cross-motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Commissioner's decision is REVERSED. This matter is REMANDED for the immediate award of benefits. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for plaintiff, and close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/12/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's time to Reply to Defendant's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment is hereby EXTENDED from the present due date of 8/24/16, by fourteen days, to the new due date of 9/13/16, and all other deadlines be EXTENDED accordingly. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/25/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's time to file a Motion For Summary Judgment is hereby EXTENDED from the present due date of 5/26/16, by forty-five days, to the new due date of 7/11/2016, and all other deadlines be extended accordingly. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/14/15 granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The clerk of the court is directed to issue process and to serve upon plaintiff the undersigned's scheduling order and Order re: Consent or Request for reassignment for social security cases. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the U.S. Marshal a completed summons, a complete d USM-285 form, sufficient copies of the summons and complaint for service of process. Within 5 days after submitting the necessary documents for service of process, plaintiff shall file in this court a declaration stating the date on which the docu ments were submitted to the U.S. Marshal. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve process and copies of the undersigned's Scheduling Order and Order re Consent or Request for Reassignment without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Copy of this order served on US Marshal)(Plummer, M) Modified on 12/14/2015 (Plummer, M).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Robert Gonzales
Represented By: Shellie Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?