Foster v. Johnson
Petitioner: Janelle Foster
Respondent: D.K. Johnson
Case Number: 2:2015cv01774
Filed: August 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/28/2017 DENYING Petitioner's application for a petition for writ of habeas corpus. A certificate of appealability is not issued. CASE CLOSED. (Henshaw, R)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/10/2016 GRANTING respondent's 14 request to seal the Marsden Hearing Transcript. (Yin, K)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Transferring Case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/21/15. New Case Number 2:15-cv-01774-KJN (HC).(Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Janelle Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D.K. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?