Porteous v. Fisher
Petitioner: Larry Brian Porteous
Respondent: Ray Fisher, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01817
Filed: June 25, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/22/2017 DENYING as moot petitioner's 40 motion to enlarge the page limit. (Yin, K)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/06/16 ordering petitioner's motion for sanctions 33 is denied without prejudice. Petitioner's motion for enlargement of page limit 34 is denied. Petitioner's request for an extension of time 35 is granted. Petitioner shall file objections to the findings and recommendations within 30 days from the date of this order. Petitioner's motion to substitute respondent 31 is denied without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/10/2016 DENYING petitioner's 27 motion to compel. IT IS RECOMMENDED that respondent's 11 motion to dismiss be granted; and this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/01/16 ordering petitioner is granted leave, nunc pro tunc, to file the supplemental opposition, and the 2/16/16 filing 22 is deemed properly filed. Respondent's motion for extension of time to file a response to the supplemental opposition 24 is granted. Respondent shall file a response to the supplemental opposition on or before 3/17/16; no further briefing is permitted by either party. Petitioner's 2/16/16 request for appointment of counsel 23 is denied without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/8/2015 DENYING without prejudice petitioner's 15 motion for appointment of counsel; GRANTING petitioner's 13 motion for an extension of time; and petitioner shall file and serve his opposition to the motion within 30 days. (Yin, K)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the SACRAMENTO Division of the Eastern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/27/15. New Case Number 2:15-cv-01817 KJN (HC). Old Case Number 1:15-cv-00956 SMS (HC). (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porteous v. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Brian Porteous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ray Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?