Morales v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Morales
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv01822
Filed: August 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/17/18 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 3/5/18 Motion for attorney fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b), 29 is GRANTED. Counsel for Plaintiff is awarded $11,003.63 in attorney fees under § ; 406(b). The Commissioner is directed to pay the fee forthwith and remit to Plaintiff the remainder any withheld benefits; and Upon receipt of the $11,003.63 in attorney fees pursuant to § 406(b), counsel shall reimburse Plaintiff in the amount of $4,800 previously paid by the government under the EAJA. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/4/17, ORDERING that plaintiff is AWARDED attorney fees in the amount of $4,800. (Kastilahn, A)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/7/2017 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 19 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Defendant's 23 cross-motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Commissioner's decision is REVERSED. This matter is REMANDED for the immediate award of benefits. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for plaintiff, and close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 07/13/16 ORDERING that defendant's due date for opposition and cross motion is EXTENDED to 08/19/16. (Benson, A)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/14/16: Plaintiff's time to file her summary judgment motion is hereby extended from June 10, 2016, to June 17, 2016. (Kaminski, H)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/10/2016 ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Motion for Summary Judgment by 6/10/2016; EXTENDING all other deadlines accordingly. (Michel, G.)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/14/15 granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The clerk of the court is directed to issue process and to serve upon plaintiff the undersigned's scheduling order and Order re: Consent or Req uest for reassignment for social security cases. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the U.S. Marshal a completed summons, a comp leted USM-285 form, sufficient copies of the summons and complaint for service of process. Within 5 days after submitting the necessary documents for service of process, plaintiff shall file in this court a declaration stating the date on which the documents were submitted to the U.S. Marshal. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve process and copies of the undersigned's Scheduling Order and Order re Consent or Request for Reassignment without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Copy of this order served on US Marshal) (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Morales
Represented By: Bess M. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?