United States of America v. Soper-Wheeler Company, LLC
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Soper-Wheeler Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01983
Filed: September 18, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/1/2017 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice; the Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of this Settlement Agreement. CASE CLOSED(Reader, L)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER re Notice of Settlement 18 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/22/2016: The pretrial conference, trial date and pre-trial deadlines are vacated. The parties shall file a stipulated dismissal no later than 1/30/201 7, or a Joint Status Report by that date if settlement has not been finalized. A Status Conference is set in this action on 2/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, and shall be automatically vacated upon the submission of the stipulated dismissal. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Pretrial Deadlines signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/16/16. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 1/16/2017, Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 2/13/2017, Discovery to be completed by 3/13/2017, Motions to be filed by 4/28/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER 14 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/28/2016 extending deadlines as follows: Expert Disclosures are now due by December 14, 2016. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures are due by January 23, 2017. Discovery to be comp leted by February 21, 2017. Motions filing deadline is extended to April 14, 2017. The Final Pretrial Conference is reset for July 17, 2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Jury Trial is reset for September 19, 2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/7/2016 ORDERING 9 that plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its amended complaint within 10 days from the date this Order is signed. The hearing set for 7/25/2016 is hereby VACATED. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Soper-Wheeler Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Colleen M Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soper-Wheeler Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?