Gonzalez v. Veterans Administration et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Gonzalez
Defendant: Veterans Administration, California State Automobile Association, Megan Pugh and Amy Peters
Case Number: 2:2015cv01997
Filed: September 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/19/2020 DENYING 139 Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment, 135 Motion for Extension of Time as to his Rule 59 Motion, and 151 Motion for 90-Day Extension. (Zignago, K.)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/3/2020 REFERRING this matter back to the District Judge assigned to this action pursuant to Local Rule 302(c)(21). All dates pending before the undersigned are VACATED. The caption on documents filed in this action shall be No. 2:15-cv-1997 MCE DB with the "PS" designation being eliminated. (Zignago, K.)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/14/19 DENYING 138 plaintiff's 9/30/19 request to waive PACER fees. (Plummer, M)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/20/19 RECOMMENDING that Plaintiff's 107 motion to reset hearings is DENIED as having been rendered moot. Plaintiff's 110 and 111 motions for leave t o amend are deemed WITHDRAWN. Plaintiff's 112 motion to deem matters admitted is DENIED. Defendant's 114 request to strike is DENIED. It is RECOMMENDED that defendant's 92 motion for summary judgment be denied. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. Matter REFERRED to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr..(Kastilahn, A)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/6/18 DENYING 69 & 91 Motions for Extension; DENYING 95 & 98 Motions to Compel; and DENYING 77 Motion to Amend the Complaint without prejudice. The 12/14/18 hearing of 92 Motion for Summary Judgment is CONTINUED to 1/25/18 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Plaintiff shall file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment by 1/11/19. (Coll, A)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/29/2018 GRANTING 78 Motion to Compel; Dr. Bash shall be deposed on 10/31/2018; and the 11/2/2018 hearing of defendant's motion to compel is VACATED. (Reader, L)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/15/18 ORDERING that defendant's 79 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time is DENIED. The hearing of defendant's 78 Motion to Compel is CONTINUED to 10/26/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Plaintiff's shall file a response on or before 10/19/18 and defendant shall file a reply, in any, to plaintiff's response on or before 10/24/18. (Kastilahn, A)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/2/18 DENYING without prejudice to renewal 71 Motion to Compel and VACATING the 10/5/18 hearing. Discovery shall be completed by 11/2/18 and all pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be completed by 12/21/18. The parties shall file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than 30 days after receiving ruling on the last dispositive motion. (Kastilahn, A)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/15/2018 GRANTING Plaintiff's request to modify the schedule in this action, DENYING without prejudice to renewal as having been rendered moot 49 Motion for Summary Judgment, DENYING as h aving been rendered moot 61 Motion to Strike defendant' reply, DENYING as having been rendered moot 62 amended Motion to deem experts timely. The July 20, 2018 hearing of plaintiff's amended motion to deem experts timely is VACATE D. Plaintiff shall disclose experts no later than 8/17/2018; Defendant shall disclose experts no later 9/7/2018; Rebuttal experts shall be disclosed no later than 9/21/2018; Discovery shall be completed by 10/19/2018; All pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be completed by 12/7/2018; and The parties shall file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than 30 days after receiving ruling on the last dispositive motion. (York, M)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 05/15/18 DECLINING to relate cases per 57 Notice of Related Case. (Benson, A.)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/29/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure due by 3/22/2018; Defendant's Expert Disclosure by 5/3/2018; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures by 5/17/2018; Discovery due by 6/14/2018; a nd Dispositive Motions filed by 8/3/2018; the 6/28/2018, Final Pretrial Conference and 8/13/2018, Bench Trial are VACATED; the parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than 30 days after receiving this Court's ruling on the last filed dispositive motion. (Reader, L)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying without prejudice to renewal 39 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/15/17. (Kaminski, H)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER adopting in full 36 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/7/17. Plaintiff's request for an order for interlocutory appeal is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/27/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 4/3/17 MOTION for a STAY 24 is DENIED. IT IS ALSO HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Request for an order for interlocutory appeal be denied. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections to these F&Rs due within fourteen days.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/6/17 ORDERING that a Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is SET for 5/19/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Plaintiff shall file and serve a status report on or before 5/5/2017, and defendant shall file and serve a status report on or before 5/12/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/5/2017 ADOPTING IN FULL 17 Findings and Recommendations; DECLINING to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the 11 First Amended Complaint's state law causes of action; DISMISSING said causes of action without prejudice. (Michel, G.)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/17/16 ORDERING that service is appropriate for the United States of America; within 15 days, plaintiff shall submit service documents (Clerk to send 1 USM form, 1 summons, a copy of the amended complaint and Consent form) to the USM and file a statement to the court regarding the submission; USM shall serve process within 90 days. RECOMMENDING that the court decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the 11 amended complaint's state law causes of action; and that the amended complaint's state law causes of action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to these F&Rs within 14 days (cc: USM). (Benson, A)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/27/16 GRANTING Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. (Jackson, T)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/20/2016 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. Plaintiff may proceed now to serve the United States of America and pursue his claims against only that defendant . Alternatively, he may delay serving the United States of America, and attempt to state a cognizable claim against defendants Pugh, Peters and CSAA over which this court would have jurisdiction. If plaintiff elects to amend his complaint to state a cognizable claim against defendants Pugh, Peters and CSAA, he has thirty days so to do, and he may skip the service instructions. If plaintiff elects to proceed now against the United States of America alone, then within thirty days, plaintiff m ust return the materials for service of process that are enclosed with this order. In this event the court will construe plaintiff's election as consent to the dismissal of all claims against defendants Pugh, Peters and CSAA, without prejudic e. Service is appropriate for the following defendant: the United States of America. The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue forthwith, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve within ninety days of the date of this order, all process pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4, without prepayment of costs. Within 15 days Plaintiff shall submit service documents to th eU.S. Marshal and shall file a statement with the court that documents have been submitted. (Zignago, K.)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/1/16: Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall show cause in writing as to why plaintiff's causes of action against defendants Pugh and Peters are not barred by the applicable statute of limitations. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Veterans Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veterans Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Automobile Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?