Hill v. Swarthout et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Hill
Defendant: Gary Swarthout, R. W. Cappel and Sandy
Case Number: 2:2015cv02012
Filed: September 23, 2015
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/24/2018 GRANTING 30 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. Dispositive motions due no later than 8/31/2018. (Henshaw, R)
January 23, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/23/18 ORDERING that plaintiff is no longer required to submit new service documents to the court because defendant Sandy returned a waiver of service of summons. ECF 23 -1. The waiver of service of summons was filed with the court on 1/18/18.(Plummer, M)
January 11, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/11/18 ORDERING the Clerk of the court shall send to plaintiff 1 USM-285 form, instruction sheet and a copy of the amended complaint filed 3/15/17 12 to be completed and returned with the notice of submission of documents within 60 days. (Plummer, M)
January 31, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/30/2017 GRANTING plaintiff's 7 request to proceed IFP. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with the concurrent CDCR order. Plaintiff's due process claims aga inst defendants Swartout and Cappel for denying his disciplinary appeals are DISMISSED without leave to amend. The remaining claims in the complaint are DISMISSED with leave to amend as set forth in this order. Within thirty days, plaintiff may file an amended complaint. The Clerk shall send plaintiff a prisoner complaint form. (Yin, K)
January 25, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/25/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 2 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Swarthout et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. W. Cappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?