Davis v. Reames, et al

Plaintiff: Deshawn Davis
Defendant: D. Reames, Macias and G. Cox
Case Number: 2:2015cv02027
Filed: September 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/8/2018 ADOPTING 39 Findings and Recommendations in full, REVOKING Plaintiff's IFP status, and DISMISSING this action without prejudice to re-filing upon pre-payment of the filing fees. CASE CLOSED. (Huang, H)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/16/18 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice to re-filing upon pre-payment of the filing fees. Motion 30 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/15/18 GRANTING 36 Motion to strike plaintiff's surreply. (Plummer, M)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER adopting in full 24 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/15/18. Defendant Cox is DISMISSED from this action for failure to state a claim. This action shall proceed as against defendants Macias and Reames ONLY. (Kastilahn, A)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 03/16/18 DENYING 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/27/2017 DENYING as unnecessary plaintiff's 17 , 18 request to file an amended complaint; and plaintiff shall file a single second amended complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 02/10/17 ordering plaintiff's first amended complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/22/2016 DENYING plaintiff's 9 motion to amend the complaint, as unneccesary. (Yin, K)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/20/15 granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is required to pay the statutory filing fee of $3350.00 for this action. Also, DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Deshawn Davis. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time 6 is denied as unnecessary. (cc: CDC Director and Financial). (Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Reames, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshawn Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Reames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?